MILES v. TIFFT
Petitioner: STANLEY E MILES, JR
Respondent: R P TIFFT
Case Number: 5:2009cv00200
Filed: June 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Gulf
Presiding Judge: ALLAN KORNBLUM
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ADOPTING 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus is DENIED. The certificate of appealability is DENIED because Petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. The clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 8/10/2012. (jcw)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 3/10/2010. (jws)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 18 Response to Habeas Petition filed by STANLEY E MILES, JR. ( Replies due by 4/19/2010.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 2/1/2010. (jws)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING 17 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by WALTER MCNEIL. (Response due by 1/19/2010; Replies due by 2/18/2010.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 1/19/2010. (jws)
December 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING 15 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by WALTER MCNEIL. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/13/2010), Replies due by 2/12/2010.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 12/24/2009. (jws)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by WALTER MCNEIL.(Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/23/2009)., Replies due by 12/23/2009.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 11/3/2009. (jws)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by WALTER MCNEIL. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/2/2009)., Replies due by 12/2/2009.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 10/9/2009. (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILES v. TIFFT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STANLEY E MILES, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R P TIFFT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?