DAWN EZELL d/b/a D & D ENVIRONMENTAL, LLC et al v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH, STATE OF FLORIDA et al
Plaintiff: DAWN EZELL d/b/a D & D ENVIRONMENTAL, LLC and ROXANNE JONES d/b/a J.R.'S ENVIRONMENTAL CONSULTING
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH, STATE OF FLORIDA, RALPH MILLER and SCOTT BUTCHER
Case Number: 5:2009cv00353
Filed: October 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Bay
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granted 161 Consent/Joint Motion For Extension Of Time To File Pretrial Stipulation ( Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/10/2010). Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 8/10/2010. (sea)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granted 134 Consented/Joint MOTION For Extension Of Time to Mediate. Mediation to take place by 7/23/2010. Mediation Report due by 7/30/2010.Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 7/20/2010. (sea)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER denied 101 Motion to Strike. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 7/16/2010. (sea)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denied 112 Motion to Disqualify. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 7/9/2010. (sea)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granted 102 Request to File A Reply ( Response to 100 motion due by by 7/12/2010. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 6/29/2010. (sea)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Discovery shall be completed by 7/14/2010.Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 6/14/2010. (sea)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER denied 91 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 6/11/2010. (sea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAWN EZELL d/b/a D & D ENVIRONMENTAL, LLC et al v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH, STATE OF FLORIDA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWN EZELL d/b/a D & D ENVIRONMENTAL, LLC
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROXANNE JONES d/b/a J.R.'S ENVIRONMENTAL CONSULTING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH, STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RALPH MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT BUTCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?