FRIEBEL et al v. PARADISE SHORES OF BAY COUNTY LLC et al
Plaintiff: JOSHUA S FRIEBEL and ELIZABETH F FRIEBEL
Defendant: PARADISE SHORES OF BAY COUNTY LLC, ROBERT E BLACKERBY and MAGNUM CAPITAL LLC
Case Number: 5:2010cv00120
Filed: May 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Bay
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 390 JUDGMENT in favor of PARADISE SHORES OF BAY COUNTY LLC against ELIZABETH F FRIEBEL, JOSHUA S FRIEBEL. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 3/19/2012. 90 Day Exhibit Return Deadline set for 6/18/2012 (jcw)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER Consideration of the Motion To Enforce Settlement Agreement 333 is stayed pending resolution of the bankruptcy case. The parties shall file written memoranda not later than 9/15/2011, addressing whether the automatic stay applies to Plas cause of action in this case & who is the proper party to pursue that claim. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 9/1/2011. (sea)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER granted 347 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to the Blackerby Defts' Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. ( Response to motion due by by 8/31/2011.) Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 8/15/2011. (sea)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER granting in part 274 Motion in Limine; granting in part 275 Motion in Limine; granting in part 276 Motion in Limine; denying 277 Motion in Limine; denying 290 Motion in Limine; denying 291 Motion in Limine; denying 305 Motion in Limine. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 7/17/2011. (jem)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 304 AMENDED ORDER REFLECTING CHANGES IN SECTION ON "MR. SCOTT": Defendants' Motions to Strike 269 and 270 are GRANTED. The new expert affidavits 267 Exhibits A & B are inadmissible. Mr. Scotts report and proposed testimony 229 Attach. 2 are inadmissible as failing Daubert. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 6/13/2011. (jem)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER denying without prejudice 265 Motion in Limine; denying without prejudice 266 Motion in Limine. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 6/2/2011. (jem)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER re 269 Dft's MOTION to Strike ( Response to motion due by by 5/31/2011.) Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 5/25/2011. (sea)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granted 260 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time ( Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/31/2011.) Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 5/23/2011. (sea)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 142 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 3/3/2011. (jcw)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Dfts' Motion To Strike Statement Of Alleged Uncontested Facts By Plas 137 & Dfts' Motion To Strike Affidavit Of Pla Elizabeth Friebel 138 are denied as moot. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 2/8/2011. (sea)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 116 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 2/7/2011. (sea)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Joint Status Report due by 12/10/2010. Discovery plan due by 12/25/2010. Bench Trial set for 6/27/2011 09:00 AM (CDT) in U.S. Courthouse Panama City before JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK. Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2011 01:30 PM (CDT) in U.S. Courthouse Panama City before JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 11/30/2010. (sea)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER that the Crossclaim of Dft Paradise Shores of Bay County, LLC against Dfts Robert E. Blackerby, Magnum Capital, LLC, and MH I, LLC (Doc. 42, P. 22-23) is dismissed. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 11/15/2010. (sea)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER that the parties shall file an amended joint report not later than 11/15/2010. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 11/12/2010. (sea)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER that the parties shall file an amended joint report not later than 11/12/2010. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 11/4/2010. (sea)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denied 65 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 11/3/2010. (sea)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that the Crossclaim of Defendant Paradise Shores Of BayCounty, LLC against Defendants Robert E. Blackerby and Magnum Capital LLC(Doc. 16, Pages 19-20) is dismissed. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 8/23/2010. (sea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRIEBEL et al v. PARADISE SHORES OF BAY COUNTY LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA S FRIEBEL
Represented By: JEFFREY MICHAEL STEPHENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH F FRIEBEL
Represented By: JEFFREY MICHAEL STEPHENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARADISE SHORES OF BAY COUNTY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT E BLACKERBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAGNUM CAPITAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?