BIRDSONG et al v. EHLKE et al
Plaintiff: JAMES BIRDSONG and KATHY BIRDSONG
Defendant: THOMAS EHLKE and OCEAN TERRACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. OF PANAMA CITY
Case Number: 5:2010cv00196
Filed: July 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Bay
Presiding Judge: MILES DAVIS
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER The case is dismissed from the active docket of the court. The clerk is directed to close the file of this case for administrative purposes, & upon the expiration of sixty days w/o activity, the clerk is direct to close the case in its entirety for all purposes. All pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 2/9/2011. (sea)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Motions for summary judgment as to Dft's Third-Party Complaint shall be filed not later than 2/24/2011. Response to these motion due by 3/7/2011. Jury Trial of Dft's Third-Party Complaint against Third-Party Deft is scheduled for 4/18/2011 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Panama City before JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 12/17/2010. (sea)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Dismiss.1. Peoples Firsts Motion to Dismiss 34 is GRANTED as to Counts IV and V, and DENIED as to Count III. 2. Count IV is dismissed without prejudice. 3. Count V is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 12/13/2010. (jcw)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denied 10 Motion for Default. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 9/14/2010. (sea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BIRDSONG et al v. EHLKE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS EHLKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN TERRACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. OF PANAMA CITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES BIRDSONG
Represented By: TERANCE MADDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY BIRDSONG
Represented By: TERANCE MADDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?