RICKERSON v. CORRECTIONS CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: KENNETH E RICKERSON
Defendant: CORRECTIONS CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Case Number: 5:2011cv00279
Filed: July 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER ADOPTING 52 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; granting 38 Motion to Dismiss; granting 45 Motion to Dismiss and this case is DISMISSED for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 2/28/2013. (atm)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER adopting 13 Report and Recommendation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/22/2012. The ADA claims against defendants Gills, Kats-Kagan, Doyle, and CCA are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. The ADA claim ag ainst defendant Harvey in her individual capacity is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. The § 1983 claims against the Florida Department of Corrections (DOC) are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. The § 1983 claims against def endant Harvey in her individual or official capacities are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. The claims for § 1983 damages against defendants Gills, Kats-Kagan and Doyle in their official capacities are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. The Florida Department of Management Services (DMS) are DISMISSED as a party to this suit because plaintiff has failed to state a claim against DMS. The only ADA claims that may go forward are plaintiffs claims against theDOC and defendant Harvey in her official capacity. The only § 1983 claims that may goforward are plaintiffs claim against CCA; against defendants Gills, Kats-Kagan, and Doyle in their official capacities, but only to the extent plaintiff seeks prospective injunctive relief; and against defendants Gills, Kats-Kagan, and Doyle in their individual capacities. (kdm)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER striking 4 MOTION for Specific Performance filed by KENNETH E RICKERSON, striking 3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by KENNETH E RICKERSON, denying 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by KENNETH E RICKERSON. The clerk is directed to mail 1983 complaint and IFP applicatoin ( Amended Pleadings due by 1/5/2012., Fee due by 1/5/2012., Motions due by 1/5/2012.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/5/11. (bkp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICKERSON v. CORRECTIONS CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH E RICKERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONS CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?