UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SELLERS

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: JUDY GRACE SELLERS
Case Number: 5:2011cv00326
Filed: October 5, 2011
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Panama City Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 73 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ; granting 65 Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment of Permanent Injunction Against Judy Sellers (Doc. 65 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 5/31/2013. (jcw)
June 25, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 31 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ; denying with prejudice 30 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 6/25/2012. (jcw)
May 25, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ; denying 16 MOTION to Dismiss, granting 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendant's counterclaims against the United States of America are DISMISSED.Defendant's third-party complaint against Pamela Marsh and Miranda Bureau are DISMISSED. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 5/25/2012. (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SELLERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: MIRANDA BUREAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDY GRACE SELLERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?