TRA FARMS INC v. SYNGENTA SEEDS INC et al

Plaintiff: TRA FARMS INC
Defendant: SYNGENTA SEEDS INC and VALDOSTA PLANT COMPANY INC
Case Number: 5:2012cv00378
Filed: November 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Calhoun
Presiding Judge: MARK E WALKER
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - At a telephone status conference on April 15, 2014, the parties agreed to asettlement conference before Magistrate Judge Charles A. Stampelos. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/15/2014. (dlt)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING as moot 56 MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/3/2014. (dlt)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER re 56 MOTION to Compel filed by SYNGENTA SEEDS INC. (Counsel for Defendant is directed to file a notice with this Court by 2/3/2014 )as to whether its motion to compel has been mooted or needs to be set for hearing. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/29/2014. (dlt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRA FARMS INC v. SYNGENTA SEEDS INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRA FARMS INC
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID MARTIN
Represented By: WILLIAM KENNETH CRISPIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNGENTA SEEDS INC
Represented By: ROBERT KING HIGH, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALDOSTA PLANT COMPANY INC
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL GREENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?