SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC v. WELCH et al

Plaintiff: SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS, LLC, as successor by merger with Vision Bank and SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC
Defendant: NEVERVE, LLC, WELCH LAW FIRM, P.C., RUSTON C. WELCH, RUSTON C WELCH, WELCH LAW FIRM PC and NEVERVE LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00252
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or Alternatively to Dismiss or Stay Under First-Filed Doctrine, and Memorandum in Support by NEVERVE LLC, RUSTON C WELCH, WELCH LAW FIRM PC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/24/2019). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Ruston Welch, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of David Stewart, #3 Exhibit 3 - Dockets, #4 Exhibit 4 - Representation Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Oklahoma Petition) (HAMMOND, CLARK)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC. NEVERVE LLC served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (GAAL, RICHARD)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC. WELCH LAW FIRM PC served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (GAAL, RICHARD)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC. RUSTON C WELCH served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (GAAL, RICHARD)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NEVERVE, LLC, RUSTON C. WELCH, WELCH LAW FIRM, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Summons Welch Law Firm, #2 Summons Neverve) (alb)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (GAAL, RICHARD)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4337217.), filed by SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS, LLC, as successor by merger with Vision Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 SUMMONS FOR RUSTON C. WELCH, #3 SUMMONS FOR WELCH LAW FIRM, P.C., #4 SUMMONS FOR NEVERVE, LLC) (GAAL, RICHARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC v. WELCH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEVERVE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELCH LAW FIRM, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSTON C. WELCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSTON C WELCH
Represented By: CLARK R HAMMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELCH LAW FIRM PC
Represented By: CLARK R HAMMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEVERVE LLC
Represented By: CLARK R HAMMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS, LLC, as successor by merger with Vision Bank
Represented By: RICHARD MARK GAAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: RICHARD MARK GAAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?