SEYMOUR et al v. KORAN

Plaintiff: SCOTT SEYMOUR and BRICKYARD HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: WILLIAM KORAN
Case Number: 5:2018cv00258
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
0 Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
1 Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BRICKYARD HOLDINGS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Brickyard Wealth Preservation Trust for BRICKYARD HOLDINGS, LLC.. (HERRING, MITCHELL)
January 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/30/2019). (djb)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BRICKYARD HOLDINGS, LLC, SCOTT SEYMOUR. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Scott Seymour, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Lisa Barnes) (SPELLMAN, MICHAEL)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/22/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/20/2019. Discovery due by 7/8/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/7/2019. (sdw)
January 7, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #7 Answer to Complaint. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by WILLIAM KORAN. (DICKEY, MICHAEL)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of Summons in a Civil Action and Complaint with Exhibits served on William Koran on December 8, 2018, filed by BRICKYARD HOLDINGS, LLC, SCOTT SEYMOUR. (HERRING, MITCHELL)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Williams Koran on December 1, 2018, filed by BRICKYARD HOLDINGS, LLC, SCOTT SEYMOUR. (HERRING, MITCHELL)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to WILLIAM KORAN. (sdw)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued by Clerk by BRICKYARD HOLDINGS, LLC, SCOTT SEYMOUR re #1 Complaint,,, (HERRING, MITCHELL)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (HERRING, MITCHELL)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM KORAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4342159.), filed by SCOTT SEYMOUR, BRICKYARD HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Operating Agreement among Black's Island Club, LLC and The Members Named Herein, #2 Exhibit 2 - Limited Liability Company Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Guaranty Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Operating Agreement of BIC Management Holdings, LLC, #5 Exhibit 5 - Exclusive Right of Sale Listing Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Rosenzweig Firm 9.17.18 Correspondence, #7 Exhibit 7 - Rosenzweig Firm 8.28.18 Correspondence, #8 Exhibit 8 - Insurance Claim Specialists, Inc. Agreement, #9 Exhibit 9 - E-mail 11.05.18 Correspondence, #10 Exhibit 10 - E-mail 11.05.18 Correspondence from Bill Koran) (HERRING, MITCHELL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEYMOUR et al v. KORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT SEYMOUR
Represented By: MITCHELL JOHANN HERRING
Represented By: MICHAEL PATRICK SPELLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRICKYARD HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: MITCHELL JOHANN HERRING
Represented By: MICHAEL PATRICK SPELLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM KORAN
Represented By: MICHAEL PATRICK DICKEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?