PRECISION IMPORTS AUTO BROKERS INC v. GLASSTREAM INC
Plaintiff: PRECISION IMPORTS AUTO BROKERS INC
Defendant: GLASSTREAM, INC.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00273
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT)(docs mailed to Attorney Clay Phillips via USPS) (sdw)
December 18, 2018 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:18-cv-00620. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 19, 2018 Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to clerk. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OPINION AND ORDER directing that: (1) the #11 MOTION to transfer Venue is GRANTED; (2) Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida, Panama City Division ; (3) directing the clerk to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer; this case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/19/18. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Precision Imports Auto Brokers Inc. (Phillips, Clay) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]
September 13, 2018 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer no longer assigned to the case as referral judge (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Precision Imports Auto Brokers Inc re #12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Phillips, Clay) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing that the #11 MOTION to transfer Venue is set for submission, without oral argument, on 9/24/2018, with any opposition brief due by 9/17/2018, and any reply to the opposition due by 9/24/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/31/18. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 12 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Precision Imports Auto Brokers Inc; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Change Venue by Glasstream, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gaal, Richard) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Phillips, Clay) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gaal, Richard) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 8 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson and Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer. Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/24/2018; directing counsel for the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the clerk on or before 8/20/2018, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/3/18. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Glasstream, Inc. re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Gaal, Richard) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, Complaint , ANSWER to Amended Complaint, Complaint by Glasstream, Inc..(Gaal, Richard) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Glasstream, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Precision Imports Auto Brokers Inc; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (all parties) Glasstream, Inc., Precision Imports Auto Brokers Inc. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]
June 28, 2018 NOTICE to state court by Glasstream, Inc. re filing of #1 Notice of Removal (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]
June 28, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Precision Imports Auto Brokers Inc. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]
June 28, 2018 AMENDED STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Glasstream, Inc., filed by Precision Imports Auto Brokers Inc. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ).(djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]
June 28, 2018 COMPLAINT against Glasstream, Inc., filed by Precision Imports Auto Brokers Inc. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ).(djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Glasstream, Inc. from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, case number 03-CV-2018-900974.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602049854) (Attachments: #1 state court complaint, #2 amended state court complaint, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 civil cover sheet, #6 fee receipt)(djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/18/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRECISION IMPORTS AUTO BROKERS INC v. GLASSTREAM INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRECISION IMPORTS AUTO BROKERS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLASSTREAM, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD MARK GAAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?