MOULDER v. BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al

Plaintiff: MICHAEL EUGENE MOULDER
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC and BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00012
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER :Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/8/2019. Discovery due by 7/23/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/23/2019. (alb)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Added attorney SARAH A LONG,JESSICA MARIE KENNEDY for BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY,SARAH A LONG,JESSICA MARIE KENNEDY for BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/23/2019. (alb)
January 22, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel of Record (See proposed ISO.) (alb)
January 21, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY.. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
January 21, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC.. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
January 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel of Record by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT (Attachments: #1 KEVIN HODGES, #2 DON HAYCRAFT, #3 VANESSA DIAZ, #4 CRAIG DOWNS) (alb)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE to CATHERINE PYUNE MCELDOWNEY (Attachments: #1 KEVIN HODGES, #2 DON HAYCRAFT, #3 VANESSA DIAZ, #4 CRAIG DOWNS) (alb)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 Case electronically transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-08458.
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Florida: IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/8/2019.(mmv) (NEF: HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/10/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/10/2019.]
October 8, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/10/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/10/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/10/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7104330) filed by Michael Eugene Moulder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Election Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Craig Downs added to party Michael Eugene Moulder(pty:pla).(Downs, Craig) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOULDER v. BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL EUGENE MOULDER
Represented By: NATHAN LEE NELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC
Represented By: FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR
Represented By: JESSICA MARIE KENNEDY
Represented By: SARAH A LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR
Represented By: JESSICA MARIE KENNEDY
Represented By: SARAH A LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?