VAZQUEZ et al v. CITY OF MEXICO BEACH et al

Plaintiff: Hector Vazquez, Crazy Beach Pizza, LLC and CRAZY BEACH PIZZA LLC
Defendant: Tanya Castro, Rex Harding Putnal, CITY OF MEXICO BEACH, Jerry B Wallace, DANIEL SIMMONS, Linda Albrecht, William L McGlothlin, CYNTHIA CLARK, Mell E. Smigielski, Alfred T. Bailey, Philip Hall, ALFRED T BAILEY and MELL E SMIGIELSKI
Case Number: 5:2019cv00015
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal (Complaint). ALFRED T BAILEY answer due 3/25/2019; PHILIP HALL answer due 3/25/2019; MELL E SMIGIELSKI answer due 3/25/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/4/2019. (djb)
March 1, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, (Complaint) (djb)
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, (Complaint) by ALFRED T BAILEY, PHILIP HALL, MELL E SMIGIELSKI. (PLATT RADY, KAYLA)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Extend Time of Deadlines Established by Initial Scheduling Order. On consideration, the Court will grant the motion as requested. Accordingly, once the other Defendants are served and have had the opportunity to appear, the joint report to the Court must be filed within 14 DAYS thereafter. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/15/2019. (MB)
February 14, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #10 Joint MOTION to Extend Time of Deadlines Established by Initial Scheduling Order (MB)
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Extend Time of Deadlines Established by Initial Scheduling Order by CRAZY BEACH PIZZA LLC, HECTOR VAZQUEZ. (RUMPH, JERRY)
February 12, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #9 Response to #5 MOTION to Dismiss (MB)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CRAZY BEACH PIZZA LLC, HECTOR VAZQUEZ. (RUMPH, JERRY)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to ALFRED T BAILEY, (Attachments: #1 CYNTHIA CLARK, #2 DANIEL SIMMONS, #3 JERRY WALLACE, #4 LINDA ALBERCHT, #5 MELL SMIGIELSKI, #6 PHILIP HALL, #7 REX PUTNAL, #8 TANYA CASTRO, #9 WILLIAM MCGLOTHLIN) (MB)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summonses for Issuance by CRAZY BEACH PIZZA LLC, HECTOR VAZQUEZ (RUMPH, JERRY)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CRAZY BEACH PIZZA LLC. (RUMPH, JERRY)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by CITY OF MEXICO BEACH. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/11/2019). (GRAHAM, WILLIAM)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/29/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/28/2019. Discovery due by 7/15/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/15/2019. (MB)
January 15, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal (please see proposed ISO). (MB)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (MB)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Adverse Parties by CITY OF MEXICO BEACH (GRAHAM, WILLIAM)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CITY OF MEXICO BEACH from Fourteenth Circuit Bay County, case number 2017-399-CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4377279.), filed by CITY OF MEXICO BEACH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix State Docket, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C) (GRAHAM, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VAZQUEZ et al v. CITY OF MEXICO BEACH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Harding Putnal
Represented By: ALISON H SAUSAMAN
Represented By: WILLIAM B GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF MEXICO BEACH
Represented By: WILLIAM B GRAHAM
Represented By: ALISON H SAUSAMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry B Wallace
Represented By: ALISON H SAUSAMAN
Represented By: WILLIAM B GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Albrecht
Represented By: ALISON H SAUSAMAN
Represented By: WILLIAM B GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William L McGlothlin
Represented By: ALISON H SAUSAMAN
Represented By: WILLIAM B GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYNTHIA CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mell E. Smigielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred T. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Hall
Represented By: KAYLA ELIZABETH PLATT RADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALFRED T BAILEY
Represented By: ALISON H SAUSAMAN
Represented By: KAYLA ELIZABETH PLATT RADY
Represented By: WILLIAM B GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELL E SMIGIELSKI
Represented By: ALISON H SAUSAMAN
Represented By: KAYLA ELIZABETH PLATT RADY
Represented By: WILLIAM B GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Vazquez
Represented By: MICHAEL JONATHAN HENRY
Represented By: CHRISTINE DANIELLE SMALLWOOD MIRANDA
Represented By: JERRY LEWIS RUMPH, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crazy Beach Pizza, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAZY BEACH PIZZA LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL JONATHAN HENRY
Represented By: CHRISTINE DANIELLE SMALLWOOD MIRANDA
Represented By: JERRY LEWIS RUMPH, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?