CATALYST FABRIC SOLUTIONS LLC et al v. E BY DESIGN LLC
Plaintiff: CATALYST FABRIC SOLUTIONS LLC
Defendant: E BY DESIGN LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00108
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting :( Discovery due by 10/31/2019., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 11/21/2019., Jury Trial set for 2/3/2020 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE., Mediation Report due by 12/13/2019.), Case referred to mediation. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/12/2019. (jcw)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH P ABELE on behalf of CATALYST FABRIC SOLUTIONS LLC (ABELE, KENNETH)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (ANDREWS, BEN)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SECOND ORDER ON JURISDICTION re #7 NOTICE of Jurisdiction and Compliance with Court's Order. The order of April 24, 2019 noted deficiencies in the removal notice's jurisdictional allegations. The defendant's response cures the deficiencies. No further action will be taken based on the April 24 order. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/14/2019. (jcw)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CATALYST FABRIC SOLUTIONS LLC. (ABELE, KENNETH)
May 14, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: #3 Initial Scheduling Order - Corporate Disclosure Statement was due by 5/8/2019 and has not been filed by CATALYST FABRIC SOLUTIONS LLC (jcw)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Jurisdiction and Compliance with Court's Order by E BY DESIGN LLC re #4 Order,, Set Deadlines, (ANDREWS, BEN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by E BY DESIGN LLC identifying Corporate Parent E by Design LLC for E BY DESIGN LLC.. (ANDREWS, BEN)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Counterclaim by CATALYST FABRIC SOLUTIONS LLC. (ABELE, KENNETH)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON JURISDICTION - Defendant's notice that identifies each of its members and sets out each member's citizenship, including the identity and citizenship of each member that is itself an entity due by 5/8/2019. Plaintiff's notice if information not filed in defendant's notice due by 5/22/2019. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 4/24/2019. (erl)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/8/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/7/2019. Discovery due by 8/20/2019. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 4/24/2019. (erl)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ANDREWS, BEN)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by E by Design LLC from Fourteenth Judicial Circuit, Jackson County, case number 2019-ca-000087. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4464612.), filed by E by Design LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (ANDREWS, BEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CATALYST FABRIC SOLUTIONS LLC et al v. E BY DESIGN LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E BY DESIGN LLC
Represented By: BEN A ANDREWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATALYST FABRIC SOLUTIONS LLC
Represented By: KENNETH P ABELE
Represented By: JONATHAN W HAYES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?