LAND et al v. ROBERTS et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL BAXTER, KENNETH SHAW, TYLER LAND, HOPE ADKINSON, DEREK WILLIAM BENEFIELD, JUSTIN CALEB CREAMER, SCOTTY J WILLIAMS, DARRELL WATKINS, LORA PENN, ABRANDA WARD, TREVOR DAY, JOHN RAINES, PATRICK THEMAR, COLE PADGETT, KIMBERLY WOOD, WILLIE SIMS, RICHARD DRIGGERS, MICHAEL BRADY, TRACI ALDAY, JOSHUA CLENNEY, TYLER DANIELS, JEFFREY SMITH and BENJAMIN BOWLING
Defendant: TREVOR LEE, SHERIFF LOUIS S ROBERTS, III, ZACHARY WESTER, JOHN ALLEN and LOUIS S ROBERTS, III
Case Number: 5:2019cv00120
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by TYLER LAND. (MATTOX, MARIE)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN F LOAR on behalf of JOHN ALLEN (LOAR, JOHN)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by GINGER BARRY BOYD on behalf of JOHN ALLEN (BOYD, GINGER)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ALLOWING AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, DENYING AS MOOT THE MOTION TO DISMISS THE ORIGINAL COMPLAINT, AND SETTING DEADLINES re denying as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss; granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer ; granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint. Mr. Wester need not respond to the original complaint. The deadline for his response to the amended complaint is 14 days after the amended complaint is filed. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/20/2019. (jcw) Modified on 7/2/2019 (jcw).
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Five Day Extension of Time to Amended Complaint by TYLER LAND. (MATTOX, MARIE) Modified on 6/20/2019 to correct document title(jcw).
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by ZACHARY WESTER. (LONGFELLOW, JOE)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TYLER LAND UPON DIVISION OF RISK MANAGEMENT (MATTOX, MARIE)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TYLER LAND. JOHN ALLEN served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. (MATTOX, MARIE)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TYLER LAND. LOUIS S ROBERTS, III served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. (MATTOX, MARIE)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TYLER LAND. TREVOR LEE served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. (MATTOX, MARIE)
June 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Sever. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/19/2019). (jcw)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING THE PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Sever.The plaintiffs must promptly file their response to the motion to dismiss. If the plaintiffs fail to file a response by June 19, 2019 or obtain an extension of the deadline, the motion to dismiss will be granted. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/13/2019. (jcw)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER :. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/31/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/15/2019. Discovery due by 9/27/2019. (jcw)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss or Sever by JOHN ALLEN, TREVOR LEE, LOUIS S ROBERTS, III. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/12/2019). (WARNER, WILLIAM)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM G WARNER on behalf of JOHN ALLEN, TREVOR LEE, LOUIS S ROBERTS, III (WARNER, WILLIAM)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to DIVISION OF RISK MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL SERVICES. (mlp)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (Allen, Wester, Lee, Roberts). (mlp)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MATTOX, MARIE)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CFLNDC-4479634.), filed by HOPE ADKINSON. (Attachments: #1 Summons to be issued by clerk, #2 Summons to be issued by Clerk, #3 Summons to be issued by Clerk, #4 Summons to be issued by Clerk, #5 Summons to be issued by Clerk) (MATTOX, MARIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAND et al v. ROBERTS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL BAXTER
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH SHAW
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYLER LAND
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOPE ADKINSON
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEREK WILLIAM BENEFIELD
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN CALEB CREAMER
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTTY J WILLIAMS
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARRELL WATKINS
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORA PENN
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABRANDA WARD
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TREVOR DAY
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN RAINES
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK THEMAR
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLE PADGETT
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY WOOD
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE SIMS
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD DRIGGERS
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL BRADY
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACI ALDAY
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA CLENNEY
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYLER DANIELS
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY SMITH
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN BOWLING
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TREVOR LEE
Represented By: ALICIA D CAROTHERS
Represented By: WILLIAM G WARNER
Represented By: ALYSSA M YARBROUGH
Represented By: TIMOTHY M WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF LOUIS S ROBERTS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZACHARY WESTER
Represented By: JOE LONGFELLOW, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ALLEN
Represented By: ALICIA D CAROTHERS
Represented By: WILLIAM G WARNER
Represented By: ALYSSA M YARBROUGH
Represented By: GINGER BARRY BOYD
Represented By: TIMOTHY M WARNER
Represented By: JOHN F LOAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS S ROBERTS, III
Represented By: ALICIA D CAROTHERS
Represented By: WILLIAM G WARNER
Represented By: ALYSSA M YARBROUGH
Represented By: TIMOTHY M WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?