CALHOUN LIBERTY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION v. XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: CALHOUN LIBERTY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION
Defendant: XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00122
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (BYRD, TUCKER)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CALHOUN LIBERTY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION. (BYRD, TUCKER)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/28/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/27/2019. Discovery due by 9/4/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 6/13/2019. Summary judgment Motions due by 9/24/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/27/2019. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/14/19. (mlp)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (CHOTVACS, CHARLES)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent XL REINSURANCE AMERICA INC, Other Affiliate EXEL Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate XLIT Ltd., Other Affiliate XL AMERICA INC, Other Affiliate XL BERMUDA LTD, Other Affiliate AXA SA, Other Affiliate AXA ASSURANCE VIE MUTUELLE for XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.. (CHOTVACS, CHARLES)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (CHOTVACS, CHARLES)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY from Fourteenth Judicial Circuit, Calhoun County, FL, case number 2019-CA-000037. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4481704.), filed by XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Pleadings) (CHOTVACS, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CALHOUN LIBERTY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION v. XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CHARLES WHEELER CHOTVACS
Represented By: CLIFFORD W SANBORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALHOUN LIBERTY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: TUCKER HARRISON BYRD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?