GREENWOOD BAPTIST CHURCH v. OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: GREENWOOD BAPTIST CHURCH
Defendant: OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00128
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (MONTGOMERY, MICHAEL)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL HOLDING COMPANY, INC. for OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY.. (MONTGOMERY, MICHAEL)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (MONTGOMERY, MICHAEL)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER :. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 5/14/2019. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/28/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/27/2019. Discovery due by 9/10/2019. (jcw)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE TO THOMAS J. MORGAN as to GREENWOOD BAPTIST CHURCH. (jcw)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jcw)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY from Fourteenth Judicial Circuit, Jackson County, FL, case number 2019 000085 CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4488169.), filed by OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (MONTGOMERY, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREENWOOD BAPTIST CHURCH v. OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL ANDREW MONTGOMERY
Represented By: JUAN PABLO CACERES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREENWOOD BAPTIST CHURCH
Represented By: JOHN D LANPHER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?