TAPPER & COMPANY PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT INC v. CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON et al

Plaintiff: TAPPER & COMPANY PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT INC. and TAPPER & COMPANY PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT INC
Defendant: SAFETY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF HANNOVER SE, INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY, GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ARIZONA, OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY, QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON and LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00151
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Agreed Order on Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Proceedings by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON, GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ARIZONA, INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY, INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF HANNOVER SE, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY, QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, SAFETY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ORANSKY, BROOKE)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions by TAPPER & COMPANY PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT INC (CONSTABLE, JAMES) Modified on 7/3/2019 to modify document title (jcw).
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by TAPPER & COMPANY PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT INC. (CONSTABLE, JAMES)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING A RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. The plaintiff must promptly respond to the motion to compel arbitration. If the plaintiff fails to do so, the motion will be granted. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/2/2019. (jcw)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re #3 Initial Scheduling Order. As required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and paragraph 13 of the initial scheduling order entered June 11, 2019, the plaintiff must immediately file a corporate disclosure statement. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/2/2019. (jcw)
June 28, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: #3 Initial Scheduling Order - Corporate Disclosure Statement has not been filed by TAPPER & COMPANY PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT INC, #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration - No response filed. (jcw)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON identifying Other Affiliate Hiscox Group Company, Other Affiliate Syndicate HIS 33, Other Affiliate Hiscox Ltd., Other Affiliate Syndicate KLN 510, Other Affiliate RJ Kiln & Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Kiln Group Limited, Other Affiliate QBE UK, Other Affiliate QBE Insurance Group Ltd. for CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON.. (MCKELL, BRIAN)
June 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/27/2019). (erl)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Demand for Arbitration) (ORANSKY, BROOKE)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER :. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/11/2019. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/25/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/25/2019. Discovery due by 10/7/2019. (jcw)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jcw)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON from Fourteenth Judicial Circuit of Florida, Gulf County, case number 2019- CA-000097. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4513195.), filed by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents) (ORANSKY, BROOKE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAPPER & COMPANY PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT INC v. CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAFETY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF HANNOVER SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ARIZONA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON
Represented By: BROOKE DANIELLE ORANSKY
Represented By: BRIAN MARCUS MCKELL
Represented By: WILLIAM DAVID WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAPPER & COMPANY PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAPPER & COMPANY PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT INC
Represented By: ALLISON SARAH FREEMAN
Represented By: JAMES SCOTT CONSTABLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?