RMI HOLDINGS v. ASPEN AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: RMI Holdings
Defendant: Aspen American Insurance Company, ORM, Inc. and ORM MERRITT ISLAND INC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00153
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
2 Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by RMI HOLDINGS. (SANBORN, CLIFFORD)
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ORM MERRITT ISLAND INC. (GRIMLEY, JOHN)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ASPEN AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (GOLDMAN, STEVEN)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 RMI Holdings ANSWER to #11 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by RMI HOLDINGS. (SANBORN, CLIFFORD)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II for all further proceedings. JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/16/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 5:19cv153-TKW/MJF.
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/30/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/29/2019. Discovery due by 1/13/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/16/2019. (sdw)
July 16, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 Answer to Amended Complaint. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 ORM, Inc. ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by ORM MERRITT ISLAND INC. (GRIMLEY, JOHN)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against RMI HOLDINGS by ASPEN AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (GOLDMAN, STEVEN)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to ORM MERRITT ISLAND INC. (sdw)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED SUMMONS by RMI HOLDINGS (SANBORN, CLIFFORD)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by RMI HOLDINGS. (SANBORN, CLIFFORD)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to ASPEN AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 ORM INC) (sdw)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Amended Summons to be issued by RMI HOLDINGS (SANBORN, CLIFFORD)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Summons to be issued by RMI HOLDINGS (SANBORN, CLIFFORD)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 *** DISREGARD, document refiled at Entry #6 *** NOTICE Summons to Be Issued by RMI HOLDINGS (SANBORN, CLIFFORD) Modified on 6/7/2019 (sdw).
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: This case is now ready for issuance of summons. However, the summons you supplied with the complaint, is not on the proper Court form and/or has not been properly completed. You may obtain the 2 page summons form by visiting our website @ http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov. Click on Forms & Publications; national court forms; AO 440 Summons in a Civil Action. The Clerk will issue summons upon resubmission. (sdw)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (sdw)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4514465.), filed by RMI Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Aspen, #3 Summons to ORM) (SANBORN, CLIFFORD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RMI HOLDINGS v. ASPEN AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen American Insurance Company
Represented By: STEVEN ERIC GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORM, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORM MERRITT ISLAND INC
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL GRIMLEY, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RMI Holdings
Represented By: CLIFFORD W SANBORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?