STRICKLAND v. AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP

Plaintiff: JAMES STRICKLAND
Defendant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP
Case Number: 5:2019cv00154
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
2 Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH J AGUDA, JR on behalf of AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP (AGUDA, JOSEPH)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/3/2019. Discovery due by 11/18/2019. Status Report due by 8/19/2019. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 7/19/2019. (alb)
July 18, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #6 Answer to Complaint (please see proposed ISO). (MB)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP identifying Corporate Parent THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION, Corporate Parent ARX HOLDING CORPORATION, Corporate Parent ARX Executive Holdings, LLLP for AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.. (PENNEKAMP, JOHN)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. (PENNEKAMP, JOHN)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II for all further proceedings. JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/16/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 5:19cv154-TKW/MJF.
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #3 Affidavit of Service.The above-referenced documents were posted incorrectly. Please re-post the documents using the correct Event Selection, under "Initial Pleadings and Service" >> "Service of Process" >> "Summons Returned Executed". The system will prompt you for the defendant served, and the date of service, and will then set an answer deadline accordingly. If you have any questions, please contact the clerk's office. (alb)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on American Strategic Insurance Corp on June 27, 2019, filed by JAMES STRICKLAND. (BOGGS, AMY)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. (MB)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JAMES STRICKLAND ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4515019.), filed by JAMES STRICKLAND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (BOGGS, AMY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRICKLAND v. AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES STRICKLAND
Represented By: AMY D BOGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP
Represented By: JOSEPH J AGUDA, JR
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL PENNEKAMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?