AULTMAN v. AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA
Plaintiff: ROBERT D AULTMAN
Defendant: AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA
Case Number: 5:2019cv00156
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline is extended to August 29, 2019. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/30/2019. AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA answer due 8/29/2019. (jcw)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint by AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (MURPHY, EUGENE)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA, filed by ROBERT D AULTMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (GARCIA, ALEJANDRO)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 26(f) Meeting Report titled Joint Discover Plan and Conference Report by AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA re #3 Scheduling Order, (MURPHY, EUGENE) Modified on 7/26/2019 to correct title (jcw).
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA identifying Corporate Parent AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE GROUP, Corporate Parent Assurant, Inc., Corporate Parent Interfinancial, Inc. for AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA.. (MURPHY, EUGENE)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT re granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline is extended to July 17, 2019. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/17/2019. AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA answer due 7/17/2019. (jcw)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, to Complaint by AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. (MURPHY, EUGENE) Modified on 6/18/2019 (jcw).
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER :. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/11/2019. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/25/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/25/2019. Discovery due by 10/9/2019. (jcw)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jcw)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA from FOURTEENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT COURT GULF COUNTY, FL, case number 232019CA000086CAAXMX. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4517107.), filed by AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite 1 - State Court Pleadings and Papers, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Service of Process, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (MURPHY, EUGENE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AULTMAN v. AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT D AULTMAN
Represented By: ALEJANDRO FRANKLIN GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA
Represented By: EUGENE P MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?