HALL et al v. WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE CO
Plaintiff: Heidi Hall and Joseph Hall
Defendant: WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE CO
Case Number: 5:2019cv00163
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (sdw)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (RYAN, TAYLOR)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/26/2019. Discovery due by 1/6/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/11/2019. (sdw)
July 10, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 Answer to Complaint. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE CO identifying Corporate Parent Brown & Brown, Inc., Other Affiliate The Wright Insurance Group, LLC for WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE CO.. (RYAN, TAYLOR)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Wright National Flood Insurance Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Defenses by WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE CO. (RYAN, TAYLOR)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Return of Service served on Wright National Flood Insurance Company on June 19, 2019, filed by HEIDI HALL, JOSEPH HALL. (BOGGS, AMY)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE CO. (alb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Pursuant to N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.2, a complete and executed Civil Cover Sheet is required in each civil case filed. Please file the civil cover sheet using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings," "Other Documents." (alb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE CO ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4522839.), filed by Heidi Hall, Joseph Hall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons) (BOGGS, AMY) Modified on 6/17/2019 to change description of attachment #2 to Summons. (alb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HALL et al v. WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE CO
Represented By: TAYLOR ROBERT RYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Hall
Represented By: AMY D BOGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Hall
Represented By: AMY D BOGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?