RAHAL-MILLER CHEVROLET-BUICK INC v. GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Plaintiff: RAHAL-MILLER CHEVROLET-BUICK INC
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00166
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Katherine R. Moskop is admitted pro hac vice to represent the Defendant pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(c). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 8/5/2019. (jcw)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by RAHAL-MILLER CHEVROLET-BUICK INC. (BADER, NICHOLAS)
August 2, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine R. Moskop.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4574575.). Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (erl)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by GENERAL MOTORS LLC identifying Corporate Parent GENERAL MOTORS HOLDINGS LLC, Corporate Parent GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY for GENERAL MOTORS LLC.. (MOSKOP, KATHERINE)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (MOSKOP, KATHERINE)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine R. Moskop.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4574575.) by GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (MOSKOP, KATHERINE)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 8/5/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/4/2019. Discovery due by 11/8/2019. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/22/2019. (erl)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT - GRANTING #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Answer due by 8/1/2019.). Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/11/2019. (erl)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint by GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (MCGRATH, JAMES)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES CHAFEL MCGRATH on behalf of GENERAL MOTORS LLC (MCGRATH, JAMES)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial served on General Motors, LLC d/b/a GMC Buick Chevrolet Cadillac on June 21, 2019, filed by RAHAL-MILLER CHEVROLET-BUICK INC. (BADER, NICHOLAS)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (jcw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION by RAHAL-MILLER CHEVROLET-BUICK INC re #1 Complaint, (BADER, NICHOLAS)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jcw)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against GENERAL MOTORS LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4525085.), filed by RAHAL-MILLER CHEVROLET-BUICK INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1, #2 Exhibit A Part 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (BADER, NICHOLAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAHAL-MILLER CHEVROLET-BUICK INC v. GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAHAL-MILLER CHEVROLET-BUICK INC
Represented By: NICHOLAS A BADER
Represented By: WILLIAM KIRBY BISSELL
Represented By: RICHARD N SOX, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Represented By: KATHERINE R MOSKOP
Represented By: JAMES CHAFEL MCGRATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?