TYRRELL et al v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: ROSEANNA TYRRELL and WILLIAM TYRRELL
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00213
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (COLGAN, MICHAEL)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (MOODY, THOMAS)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (COLGAN, MICHAEL)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 8/7/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/6/2019. Discovery due by 11/12/2019. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/24/2019. (erl)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT for PARIS RICHARD WEBB as to WILLIAM TYRRELL AND ROSEANNA TYRRELL. (jcw)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jcw)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty US, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty, Inc. for LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY.. (COLGAN, MICHAEL)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY from Fourteenth Judicial Circuit in and For Bay County, Florida, case number 19001811CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CFLNDC-4549862.), filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (COLGAN, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TYRRELL et al v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSEANNA TYRRELL
Represented By: PARIS RICHARD WEBB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM TYRRELL
Represented By: PARIS RICHARD WEBB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL O'BRIEN COLGAN
Represented By: THOMAS JAMES MOODY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?