OSBORNE v. OSWALD et al
Plaintiff: GARRY W. OSBORNE and GARRY W OSBORNE
Defendant: R & L ENTERPRISES, INC. d/b/a PAPA JOHN'S PIZZA PANAMA CITY BEACH, MICHAEL OSWALD, PAPA JOHN'S USA, INC., PAUL G. ROBINSON, PAUL G ROBINSON, R&L ENTERPRISES INC, PAPA JOHN'S USA INC and MICHAEL D OSWALD
Case Number: 5:2019cv00252
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REMAND re granting #4 Motion to Remand to State Court. The case is remanded to the Circuit Court, Fourteenth Judicial Circuit, Bay County, Florida. The clerk must take all steps necessary to effect the remand. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 8/29/2019. (Certified copy of order and docket sent to Fourteenth Judicial Circuit.) (jcw)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by MICHAEL D OSWALD, R&L ENTERPRISES INC, PAUL G ROBINSON. (WADE, LINDA)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by GARRY W OSBORNE. (PITTMAN, CARL)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER :. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 8/9/2019. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 8/23/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/23/2019. Discovery due by 11/28/2019. (jcw)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WADE, LINDA)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PAUL G. ROBINSON, R & L ENTERPRISES, INC. d/b/a PAPA JOHN'S PIZZA PANAMA CITY BEACH, MICHAEL OSWALD from Bay County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-001636. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4571676.), filed by PAUL G. ROBINSON, R & L ENTERPRISES, INC. d/b/a PAPA JOHN'S PIZZA PANAMA CITY BEACH, MICHAEL OSWALD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (WADE, LINDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OSBORNE v. OSWALD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & L ENTERPRISES, INC. d/b/a PAPA JOHN'S PIZZA PANAMA CITY BEACH
Represented By: LINDA HOHLT WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL OSWALD
Represented By: LINDA HOHLT WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAPA JOHN'S USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL G. ROBINSON
Represented By: LINDA HOHLT WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL G ROBINSON
Represented By: LINDA HOHLT WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&L ENTERPRISES INC
Represented By: LINDA HOHLT WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAPA JOHN'S USA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL D OSWALD
Represented By: LINDA HOHLT WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARRY W. OSBORNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARRY W OSBORNE
Represented By: CARL WESLEY PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?