FOLSOM et al v. AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY
Plaintiff: John M. Folsom, Joy Folsom and JOHN M FOLSOM
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY and AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00267
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REVISING THE SCHEDULE Re: granting #17 First MOTION to Extend Time. The discovery deadline is extended to 2/10/2020. This automatically moves the summary-judgment and mediation deadlines. The trial is rescheduled for the two-week period that begins on 5/4/2020. A party with a conflict during that period must file a notice by November 18, 2019. This order does not change the deadlines for Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) disclosures, but the parties may extend those deadlines by agreement. (Dispositive Motions to be filed by 3/2/2020. Mediation Report due by 3/9/2020.) Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/2/2019. (jcw)
October 31, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: #17 First MOTION to Extend Time Regarding All Discovery and Disclosure Deadlines (MB)
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 First MOTION to Extend Time Regarding All Discovery and Disclosure Deadlines by JOHN M FOLSOM, JOY FOLSOM. (SULLIVENT, DAMIAN)
October 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by DAMIAN SCOTT SULLIVENT on behalf of JOHN M FOLSOM, JOY FOLSOM (SULLIVENT, DAMIAN)
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT JEFFREY DORNSTEIN on behalf of AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY (DORNSTEIN, SCOTT)
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant's ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY. (DORNSTEIN, SCOTT)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 DISCOVERY ADVISORY: Re #12 Rule 26 Disclosures filed by JOHN M FOLSOM, JOY FOLSOM. Counsel's attention is directed to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(d), which prohibits the filing of discovery materials (including notices of deposition, deposition transcripts, interrogatories and interrogatory responses and notices thereof, production requests and responses and notices thereof, and admissions requests and responses and notices thereof) and disclosures under Rules 26(a)(1) and 26(a)(2), unless and until needed for consideration of pending motions by the court. This advisory serves as notice that no further discovery materials should be filed and all discovery posting options have been removed from CMECF. (jcw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 26 Disclosures by JOHN M FOLSOM, JOY FOLSOM. (SULLIVENT, DAMIAN)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by ANNE E KEVLIN on behalf of AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY (KEVLIN, ANNE)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting :( Discovery due by 12/10/2019., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 12/31/2019., Jury Trial set for 3/2/2020 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE., Mediation Report due by 1/7/2020.), Case referred to mediation.. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/5/2019. (jcw)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (BOGGS, AMY)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY, filed by JOHN M FOLSOM, JOY FOLSOM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (BOGGS, AMY)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE THE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DENYING AS MOOT THE MOTION TO DISMISS THE ORIGINAL COMPLAINT re #5 Motion to Dismiss; #6 Motion for Leave to File. The plaintiff must re-file the first amended complaint as a separate document. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 8/27/2019. (jcw)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by JOHN M FOLSOM, JOY FOLSOM. (BOGGS, AMY)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/30/2019). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (COLGAN, MICHAEL)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER :. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 8/14/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/27/2019. Discovery due by 12/10/2019. (jcw)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jcw)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY (COLGAN, MICHAEL) Modified on 8/12/2019 (jcw).
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY from FOURTEENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, BAY COUNTY, case number 2019-CA-002554. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4583827.), filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (COLGAN, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOLSOM et al v. AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Folsom
Represented By: SCOTT WILLIAM VIETH
Represented By: AMY D BOGGS
Represented By: DAMIAN SCOTT SULLIVENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN M FOLSOM
Represented By: SCOTT WILLIAM VIETH
Represented By: AMY D BOGGS
Represented By: DAMIAN SCOTT SULLIVENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL O'BRIEN COLGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL O'BRIEN COLGAN
Represented By: SCOTT JEFFREY DORNSTEIN
Represented By: ANNE E KEVLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?