VANN v. GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: John Howell Vann
Defendant: GEOVERA INSURANCE and GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00272
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings RE #19 Order. Status Report due by 11/4/2019. (alb)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER STAYING CASE. this case is STAYED pending completion of the appraisal process provided for in the insurance policy. The parties shall file a status report 60 days from the date of this Order, and every 30 days thereafter, indicating whether the stay should be lifted. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/4/2019. (alb)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER the order to show cause (Doc. #14 , at 2) is discharged and no sanctions will be imposed. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/4/2019. (alb)
September 4, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #13 MOTION to Stay, #17 Response in Opposition to Motion to Stay and Order to Show Cause. (alb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Stay and Order to Show Cause filed by JOHN HOWELL VANN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (DEIS, CHRISTINE)
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable address not known. Re: #8 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE. (alb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by JOHN HOWELL VANN. (DEIS, CHRISTINE)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 MOTION to Stay. On or before 9/4/2019, Plaintiff shall file his response to the renewed motion to stay. Counsel for Plaintiff shall show cause why they should not be sanctioned for failing to confer with counsel for Defendant on the renewed motion to stay as required by N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 7.1(B). Signed by JUDGE KENT T. WETHERELL II on 8/27/2019. (alb) Modified on 8/28/2019 to correct the Judge (alb).
August 27, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #13 Status Report and Renewed MOTION to Stay. (alb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT and Renewed Motion to Stay by GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (HOOKS, JONATHAN) Modified to a motion on 8/27/2019 (alb).
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER :Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 8/29 /2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/30/2019. Discovery due by 12/12/2019. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 8/15/2019. (alb)
August 14, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #11 Notice of Appearance. (See proposed ISO.) (alb)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE MARIE DEIS on behalf of JOHN HOWELL VANN (DEIS, CHRISTINE)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice to filing an amended motion containing the certificate required by N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 7.1(C), re #4 Motion to Stay Pending Appraisal. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 8/13/2019. (alb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING mailed to attorneys Matthew Struble and Joshua Gilbert and Struble P.A. 101 Northeast Third Avenue Suite 1110, Fort Lauderdale, FL. 33301. (alb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE mailed to attorneys Matthew Struble and Joshua Gilbert and Struble P.A. 101 Northeast Third Avenue Suite 1110, Fort Lauderdale, FL. 33301. (alb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Pursuant to N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.2, a complete and executed Civil Cover Sheet is required in each civil case filed. Please file the civil cover sheet using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings," "Other Documents." (alb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (alb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by GEOVERA INSURANCE identifying Corporate Parent GeoVera Holdings, Inc. for GEOVERA INSURANCE.. (HOOKS, JONATHAN)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay Pending Appraisal by GEOVERA INSURANCE. (HOOKS, JONATHAN)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by GEOVERA INSURANCE identifying Corporate Parent GeoVera Holdings, Inc. for GEOVERA INSURANCE.. (HOOKS, JONATHAN)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Supplemental Notice of Removal by GEOVERA INSURANCE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B) (HOOKS, JONATHAN)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEOVERA INSURANCE from 14th Circuit Civil, Bay County, Florida, case number 19002146CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4585949.), filed by GEOVERA INSURANCE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (HOOKS, JONATHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VANN v. GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Howell Vann
Represented By: CHRISTINE MARIE DEIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEOVERA INSURANCE
Represented By: JONATHAN MICHAEL HOOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JONATHAN MICHAEL HOOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?