JACKSON v. CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA
Plaintiff: BRYCE JACKSON
Defendant: CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA
Case Number: 5:2019cv00278
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/30/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/30/2019. Discovery due by 1/13/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/16/2019. (sdw)
September 13, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #5 Answer to Complaint. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA. (ADKINS, GWENDOLYN)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BRYCE JACKSON. CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (MATTOX, MARIE)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 DIVISION OF RISK MANAGEMENT) (sdw)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MATTOX, MARIE)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BFLNDC-4586332.), filed by BRYCE JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Summons to be issued by clerk, #2 Summons to be issued by Clerk) (MATTOX, MARIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON v. CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYCE JACKSON
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA
Represented By: GWENDOLYN PALMER ADKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?