STEELE v. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: Jean Marie Steele
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company and Castle Key Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00281
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4001
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (PENNEKAMP, JOHN)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Copy of Certified Policy of Insurance by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, CASTLE KEY INSURANCE COMPANY re #11 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (MOLHEM, DAVID)
October 1, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: #3 Initial Scheduling Order - Rule 26 meeting report has not been filed. (jcw)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SECOND ORDER ON THE MOTION TO COMPEL AN APPRAISAL re #6 MOTION to Compel. Castle Key may file a copy of its policy, including its appraisal provision, by 10/14/2019. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/30/2019. (jcw)
September 30, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: #10 Order on Motion to Compel - No response filed. (jcw)
September 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Stay Defendant's Motion to Abate Action, Stay Discovery and Compel Appraisal and Memorandum of Law. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/25/2019). (jcw)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING A RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO COMPEL AN APPRAISAL re #6 Motion to Compel. The plaintiff must file by September 25, 2019 a memorandum in response to Castle Key's motion. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/18/2019. (jcw)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CASTLE KEY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Other Affiliate ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate LAWRENCE H. PERRY, Other Affiliate CASTLE KEY INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate JEAN MARIE STEELE, Other Affiliate David W. Molhem, Other Affiliate Molhem & Fraley, P.A., Other Affiliate Mike Pennekamp, Other Affiliate Fowler White Burnett PA, Other Affiliate Perry & Young, P.A. for CASTLE KEY INSURANCE COMPANY.. (MOLHEM, DAVID)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT re #6 MOTION to StayDefendant's Motion to Abate Action, Stay Discovery and Compel Appraisal and Memorandum of Law in support of by CASTLE KEY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (MOLHEM, DAVID)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent THE ALLSTATE CORPORATION, Corporate Parent ALLSTATE INSURANCE HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE PROGRAM, Other Affiliate FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY for ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (PENNEKAMP, JOHN)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's Motion to Abate Action, Stay Discovery and Compel Appraisal and Memorandum of Law by CASTLE KEY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (MOLHEM, DAVID) Modified on 8/30/2019 (jcw).
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial by CASTLE KEY INSURANCE COMPANY. (MOLHEM, DAVID)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (PENNEKAMP, JOHN)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER :. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 8/16/2019. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 8/30/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/30/2019. Discovery due by 12/13/2019. (jcw)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jcw)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company from 14th Judicial Circuit in and for Bay County, Florida, case number 19002644CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4589017.), filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (PENNEKAMP, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEELE v. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Marie Steele
Represented By: HENRY LAWRENCE PERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL PENNEKAMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castle Key Insurance Company
Represented By: DAVID WAYNE MOLHEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?