JEREMY A. LEWIS, DMD, PA v. OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: JEREMY A. LEWIS, DMD, PA
Defendant: OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00293
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER re #9 Joint Report. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/20/2020. Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Mediation to take place by 6/29/2020. Mediation Report due by 7/13/2020. Jury Trial set for 7/22/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/1/2019. (sdw)
September 30, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (sdw)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (MONTGOMERY, MICHAEL)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN EDWARD BUKOWSKI on behalf of JEREMY A. LEWIS, DMD, PA (BUKOWSKI, JONATHAN)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by LARRY EDWARD BACHE, JR on behalf of JEREMY A. LEWIS, DMD, PA (BACHE, LARRY)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY for OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY.. (MONTGOMERY, MICHAEL)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (MONTGOMERY, MICHAEL)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/3/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/2/2019. Discovery due by 12/17/2019. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 8/19/2019. (sdw)
August 19, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE. (mailed via USPS to Jonathan Bukowski) (Attachments: #1 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT) (sdw)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MONTGOMERY, MICHAEL)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY from FOURTEENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT JACKSON COUNTY, FL, case number 2019 CA 000356. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4592132.), filed by OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (MONTGOMERY, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JEREMY A. LEWIS, DMD, PA v. OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY A. LEWIS, DMD, PA
Represented By: JONATHAN EDWARD BUKOWSKI
Represented By: LARRY EDWARD BACHE, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL ANDREW MONTGOMERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?