ESTATE OF JAMES A CONWAY v. INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF JAMES A CONWAY
Defendant: INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00318
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by ESTATE OF JAMES A CONWAY. (PUCHADES, MICHAEL)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER re #4 Joint Report. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 5/15/2020. Discovery due by 4/24/2020. Mediation to take place by 5/15/2020. Mediation Report due by 5/29/2020. Jury Trial set for 7/13/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/16/2019. (sdw)
October 15, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #4 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (sdw)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (THARP, CHARLES)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (THARP, CHARLES)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/17/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/17/2019. Discovery due by 12/30/2019. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/3/2019. (sdw)
August 30, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY from 14th Judicial Circuit - Bay County, case number 19-002281CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4606930.), filed by INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) (THARP, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESTATE OF JAMES A CONWAY v. INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF JAMES A CONWAY
Represented By: MICHAEL A PUCHADES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CHARLES ANDREW THARP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?