MCCALLISTER et al v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: EULLA AND HARRY MCCALLISTER
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00323
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (DORNSTEIN, SCOTT)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline is extended to September 23, 2019. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY answer due 9/23/2019. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/16/2019. (jcw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint) (DORNSTEIN, SCOTT)
September 9, 2019 Set/Reset Deadline - Clerk to check status of attorney admission for LEO A. MANZANILLA on 10/11/2019. (jcw)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE for LEO A. MANZANILLA as to EULLA MCCALLISTER and HARRY MCCALLISTER. (jcw)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jcw)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC, Corporate Parent AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY US INC, Corporate Parent AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY INC for LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY.. (DORNSTEIN, SCOTT)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY from iN THE FOURTEENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT COURT IN AND FOR JACKSON COUNTY, FLORIDA, case number 19-CA-371. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4612376.), filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet 4) (DORNSTEIN, SCOTT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCALLISTER et al v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: SCOTT JEFFREY DORNSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EULLA AND HARRY MCCALLISTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?