BODNER et al v. THUNDERBIRD PRODUCTS CORP et al
Plaintiff: Teri Bodner and William Bodner
Defendant: Thunderbird Products Corp. d/b/a Formula Boats, Motion Systems Corporation, Porter, Inc. d/b/a Formula Boats, PORTER INC and THUNDERBIRD PRODUCTS CORP
Case Number: 5:2019cv00351
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Marine Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The deadline proposed by the parties is adopted by the Court (Discovery due by 1/21/2021.) The deadline for filing motions for summary judgment or other potentially dispositive motions is 14 days after the discovery deadline (2/4/2021.) The deadline for completing mediation is 21 days after the discovery deadline (2/11/2021.) Mediation Report due by 2/25 /2021. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/31/2019. (alb) Modified on 10/31/2019 to correct the deadlines to 2021 at the atty request. Discovery date on Report of Rule 26 is incorrect. (alb).
October 31, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (alb)
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting The correct case number is 5:19-cv-00351-TKW-MJF and should be so reflected on all future filings. (alb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (HERNANDEZ, JONATHAN)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Remand. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/28/2019. (alb)
October 22, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION to Remand , #8 Response in Opposition to Motion. (sdw)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by PORTER INC, THUNDERBIRD PRODUCTS CORP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service of Complaint) (HERNANDEZ, JONATHAN)
October 9, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings re #7 Motion to Remand. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/23/2019). (alb)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by TERI BODNER, WILLIAM BODNER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1- Service Email, #2 Exhibit Attachment 2- Business Entity Report, #3 Exhibit Attachment 3 - Certificate of Merger) (PITTMAN, CARL)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN HERNANDEZ on behalf of PORTER INC, THUNDERBIRD PRODUCTS CORP (HERNANDEZ, JONATHAN)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by PORTER INC, THUNDERBIRD PRODUCTS CORP. (HERNANDEZ, JONATHAN)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 10/9 /2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/8/2019. Discovery due by 1/21/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/25/2019. (alb)
September 24, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (See proposed ISO.) (alb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Please note for future reference that aliases (DBA) are entered separately and are not to be included in the party name. The party name will be corrected by the clerk. (alb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (alb)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Porter, Inc. d/b/a Formula Boats, Thunderbird Products Corp. d/b/a Formula Boats from 14th Judicial Circuit in and for Bay County Florida, case number 19003115CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4628688.), filed by Porter, Inc. d/b/a Formula Boats, Thunderbird Products Corp. d/b/a Formula Boats. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (VALCOURT, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BODNER et al v. THUNDERBIRD PRODUCTS CORP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thunderbird Products Corp. d/b/a Formula Boats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motion Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porter, Inc. d/b/a Formula Boats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTER INC
Represented By: MATTHEW JOHN VALCOURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THUNDERBIRD PRODUCTS CORP
Represented By: RUSSELL M PFEIFER
Represented By: MATTHEW JOHN VALCOURT
Represented By: JONATHAN HERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri Bodner
Represented By: CARL WESLEY PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bodner
Represented By: CARL WESLEY PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?