WILLOW LAKES COMMERCIAL CENTER OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC v. WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: WILLOW LAKES COMMERCIAL CENTER, OWNER'S ASSOCIATION, INC. and WILLOW LAKES COMMERCIAL CENTER OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC
Defendant: WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00379
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MEDIATION re Scheduling by WILLOW LAKES COMMERCIAL CENTER OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC (BARNHILL, DAVID)
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 26 Disclosures by WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY. (STAPE, MAXWELL)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. The #11 notice of trial conflict is STRICKEN. Defendant may file an amended notice that complies with the scheduling order. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 11/13/2019. (sdw)
November 12, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #11 NOTICE of Trial Conflict. (sdw)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 ***STRICKEN per #12 Order*** NOTICE of Trial Conflict by WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY re #10 Order Referring Case to Mediation,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (STAPE, MAXWELL) Modified on 11/13/2019 (sdw).
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER re #9 Joint Report. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 1/6/2020. Discovery due by 2/5/2020. Mediation to take place by 2/7/2020. Jury Trial set for 5/26/2020 . Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 11/5/2019. (sdw)
November 4, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (sdw)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (STAPE, MAXWELL)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WILLOW LAKES COMMERCIAL CENTER OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC identifying Other Affiliate WILLIAM PATTERSON, Other Affiliate MIKE CARROLL, Other Affiliate David D Barnhill, Other Affiliate McDonald & Barnhill, P.A., Other Affiliate Joshua Connor, Other Affiliate Coastal Claim Consultants, Other Affiliate Terri jermyn, Other Affiliate Andrew McDonald for WILLOW LAKES COMMERCIAL CENTER OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC.. (BARNHILL, DAVID)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to Strike by WILLOW LAKES COMMERCIAL CENTER OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC re #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons, (BARNHILL, DAVID)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 ***STRICKEN per #7 Notice*** Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WILLOW LAKES COMMERCIAL CENTER OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC identifying Other Affiliate William Petterson, Other Affiliate Andrew P McDonald, Other Affiliate David D Barnhill, Other Affiliate McDonald & Barnhill, P.A., Other Affiliate Joshua Connor, Other Affiliate Coastal Claim Consultants for WILLOW LAKES COMMERCIAL CENTER OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC.. (BARNHILL, DAVID) Modified on 10/24/2019 (sdw).
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AIG for WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY.. (STAPE, MAXWELL)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY. (STAPE, MAXWELL)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 10/23/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/22/2019. Discovery due by 2/5/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/9/2019. (sdw)
October 8, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (sdw)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY from Fourteenth Judicial Circuit, Bay County, FL, case number 19-003253. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4644945.), filed by WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit in Support of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - State Court Pleadings) (STAPE, MAXWELL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLOW LAKES COMMERCIAL CENTER OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC v. WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MAXWELL HARRISON STAPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLOW LAKES COMMERCIAL CENTER, OWNER'S ASSOCIATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLOW LAKES COMMERCIAL CENTER OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC
Represented By: DAVID DUFF BARNHILL
Represented By: ANDREW PHILIP MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?