JOSEPHS v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: HUGH JOSEPHS, JR
Defendant: MR. PAYNE, JOHN & JANE DOES 1 TO 200, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, GOVERNOR OF FLORIDA, WARDEN GULF CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, WARDEN, CENTRAL FLORIDA RECEPTION CENTER, SECRETARY FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and LT DANIELS
Case Number: 5:2019cv00406
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #14 Case Transferred In - Middle District of Florida Transfer, #1 Complaint. (MB)
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, HUGH JOSEPHS, JR. (MB)
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 6:18-cv-02132. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The April 25, 2019 Order (Doc. #9 ) dismissing the case without prejudice is VACATED. The Clerk of Court is directed to vacate Judgment (Doc. #10 ) and reopen this case. The Clerk of Court shall transfer this case to the United States District Court, Northern District of Florida, Panama City Division. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/17/2019. (JLC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/18/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hugh Josephs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate)(BIA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 4/30/2019 (BIA). **Document incorrectly styled to Northern Division. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/18/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Florida Department of Corrections, Mr. Payne, LT Daniels, John & Jane Does 1 to 200; Terminating Warden Gulf Correctional Institution (Mrs. Ponder), Warden, Central Florida Reception Center (Mr. Cumbie), Governor Of Florida (Rick Scott) and Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections (Julie L. Jones) filed by Hugh Josephs, Jr. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Hugh Josephs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BIA) Modified on 4/30/2019 (BIA). **Document incorrectly styled to Northern Division. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/18/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 **VACATED PER ORDER #13 ** JUDGMENT that this case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (BIA) Modified on 10/18/2019 (BIA). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/18/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 **VACATED PER ORDER #13 ** ORDER dismissing case. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/25/2019. (JLC) Modified on 10/18/2019 (BIA). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/18/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall amend his complaint within 21 days from the date of this Order. Plaintiff is advised that failure to fully comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff a copy of the standard civil rights complaint form along with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 3/27/2019. (EJS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/18/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:18-cv-2132-ORL-37-LRH. Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding no longer assigned to the case. (LMM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/18/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-24878. File received electronically [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/18/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. The Report and Recommendations DE #4 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. All pending motions are DENIED as MOOT and the Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/12/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc) [Transferred from flsd on 12/13/2018.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/18/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, filed by Hugh Josephs, Jr.; Recommending that this case be TRANSFERRED to the Middle District of Florida or, alternatively, the Northern District of Florida. It is further recommended that the case be closed. Objections to R&R due by 12/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 11/27/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn) [Transferred from flsd on 12/13/2018.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/18/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hugh Josephs, Jr. (jas) [Transferred from flsd on 12/13/2018.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/18/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2003-19, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jas) [Transferred from flsd on 12/13/2018.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/18/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Florida Department of Corrections, Governor of Florida, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, Warden, Central Florida Reception Center, Warden, Gulf Correctional Institution. Filing fee $ 350.00. IFP Filed, filed by Hugh Josephs, Jr.(jas) (Main Document 1 replaced due to document unreadable on 11/26/2018) (nc). Modified docket text on 11/26/2018 (nc). [Transferred from flsd on 12/13/2018.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOSEPHS v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. PAYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN & JANE DOES 1 TO 200
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNOR OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN GULF CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN, CENTRAL FLORIDA RECEPTION CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT DANIELS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUGH JOSEPHS, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?