GRAY v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: MARTHA GRAY
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00470
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The Discovery deadline is 7/17/2020. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 8/7/2020. The deadline for completing mediation proposed by the parties 6/12/2020. Mediation Report due by 6/26/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 12/26/2019. (djb)
December 26, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (djb)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (MOODY, THOMAS)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (SECHRIST, LINDSAY)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/29/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/30/2019. Discovery due by 3/12/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 11/14/2019. (alb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS JAMES MOODY on behalf of LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY (MOODY, THOMAS)
November 13, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (See proposed ISO.) (alb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc.,, Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty US, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty, Inc. for LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY.. (SECHRIST, LINDSAY)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY from Fourteenth Judicial Circuit in and For Bay County, Florida, case number 19003742CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4698912.), filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (SECHRIST, LINDSAY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAY v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTHA GRAY
Represented By: PARIS RICHARD WEBB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: LINDSAY LEE SECHRIST
Represented By: THOMAS JAMES MOODY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?