DRUMMOND v. PD FLORIDA, LLC PARENT
Plaintiff: LORI DRUMMOND
Defendant: PD FLORIDA, LLC PARENT and PD FLORIDA LLC PARENT
Case Number: 5:2019cv00472
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint and to Extend Time to File Rule 26(f) Joint Report by PD FLORIDA LLC PARENT. (LEVITT, MARK)
December 28, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #6 Scheduling Order. (No Corporate Disclosure Statement filed.) (alb)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. PD FLORIDA LLC PARENT answer due 1/10/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 12/12/2019. (alb)
December 11, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (sdw)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by PD FLORIDA LLC PARENT. (LEVITT, MARK)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/26/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/24/2020. Discovery due by 4/8/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 12/10/2019. (alb) Modified on 12/12/2019 to correct dates (alb).
December 10, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #5 Notice of Appearance. (See proposed ISO.) (alb)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK E LEVITT on behalf of PD FLORIDA LLC PARENT (LEVITT, MARK)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LORI DRUMMOND. PD FLORIDA LLC PARENT served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (STORCH, NOAH)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PD FLORIDA, LLC PARENT. (alb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (alb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against PD FLORIDA, LLC PARENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4699964.), filed by LORI DRUMMOND. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (STORCH, NOAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DRUMMOND v. PD FLORIDA, LLC PARENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORI DRUMMOND
Represented By: NOAH E STORCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PD FLORIDA, LLC PARENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PD FLORIDA LLC PARENT
Represented By: MARK E LEVITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?