SCOTT v. ADVANCED PHARMACEUTICAL CONSULTANTS INC et al
Plaintiff: Ronda Scott
Defendant: CENTURION OF FLORIDA, LLC, Advanced Pharmaceutical ConsulataNTS, iNC., CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC and ADVANCED PHARMACEUTICAL CONSULTANTS INC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00571
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint Acknowledgment filed by RONDA SCOTT., WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RONDA SCOTT. ADVANCED PHARMACEUTICAL CONSULTANTS INC waiver sent on 1/9/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (JOHNSON, RICHARD)
January 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER UNSEALING THE FILE re granting #3 Motion to Unseal Case. The clerk must unseal the file. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 1/18/2020. (jcw)
January 13, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Unseal Case by RONDA SCOTT. (jcw)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JOHNSON, RICHARD)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Advanced Pharmaceutical ConsulataNTS, iNC., CENTURION OF FLORIDA, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4756004.), filed by Ronda Scott. (JOHNSON, RICHARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCOTT v. ADVANCED PHARMACEUTICAL CONSULTANTS INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTURION OF FLORIDA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Pharmaceutical ConsulataNTS, iNC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADVANCED PHARMACEUTICAL CONSULTANTS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronda Scott
Represented By: RICHARD ERROL JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?