DUKE v. HOLIDAY CVS LLC
Plaintiff: SUSAN DUKE
Defendant: HOLIDAY CVS LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00066
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting :( Discovery due by 10/23/2020., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 11/13/2020., Jury Trial set for 3/15/2021 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER., Mediation Report due by 12/4/2020.), Case referred to mediation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/8/2020. (jcw)
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (RIPPLE, RAYMOND)
March 27, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings Status Report due by 4/27/2020. (jcw)
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by HOLIDAY CVS LLC. (RIPPLE, RAYMOND)
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIKA ESAN GOODMAN on behalf of SUSAN DUKE (GOODMAN, ERIKA)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIKA ESAN GOODMAN on behalf of SUSAN DUKE (GOODMAN, ERIKA)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Ripple has satisfied the requirements to appear in that capacity. Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED and Mr. Ripple is admitted to appear pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/27/2020. (jcw)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4902752.) by HOLIDAY CVS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (RIPPLE, RAYMOND)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/10/2020. Discovery due by 6/25/2020. Status Report due by 3/27/2020. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/26/2020. (jcw)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by HOLIDAY CVS LLC identifying Corporate Parent CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, Other Affiliate CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for HOLIDAY CVS LLC.. (RILEY, MICHAEL)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by HOLIDAY CVS LLC. (RILEY, MICHAEL)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HOLIDAY CVS LLC from Circuit Court of the Fourteenth Judicial Circuit, Bay County, case number 19004039CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4894738.), filed by HOLIDAY CVS LLC. (RILEY, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUKE v. HOLIDAY CVS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN DUKE
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Represented By: ERIKA ESAN GOODMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLIDAY CVS LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL E RILEY
Represented By: RAYMOND M RIPPLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?