CONSTANT v. BROWN et al
Plaintiff: BRIAN CHARLES PIERRE CONSTANT, III
Defendant: J LAND, FOSKEY, PEARSON, K L MADRID and JEFFREY BROWN
Case Number: 5:2020cv00085
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION TO BE COMPENSATED - (ADD TO RELIEF REQUESTED). Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO BE COMPENSATED - (ADD TO RELIEF REQUESTED) by BRIAN CHARLES PIERRE CONSTANT, III. (jcw)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of BRIAN CHARLES PIERRE CONSTANT, III. Because Plaintiff has no funds accrued in his prison trust fund account, the court will not assess Plaintiff an initial partial filing fee as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A). The clerk of court shall MAIL a copy of this order with the appropriate cover letter to: Department of Corrections, 501 South Calhoun St., Tallahassee, FL 32399-2500, Attention: Agency Clerk.Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the clerk of court shall forward to Plaintiff a form for consenting to have a United States Magistrate Judge exercise civil jurisdiction, with the case number written on it. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 3/18/2020. (jcw)(cc: DOC as directed) (Form mailed as ordered.)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (jcw)
March 11, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by BRIAN CHARLES PIERRE CONSTANT, III. (jcw)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JEFFREY BROWN, FOSKEY, J LAND, K L MADRID, PEARSON, filed by BRIAN CHARLES PIERRE CONSTANT, III. (Filing fee was not paid. No service copies filed.) (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONSTANT v. BROWN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J LAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSKEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEARSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K L MADRID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN CHARLES PIERRE CONSTANT, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?