RUSSAW v. JACKSON COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS et al
Plaintiff: RODNEY RUSSAW
Defendant: JACKSON COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS and SHAWN WOODS
Case Number: 5:2020cv00151
Filed: May 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/10/2020. Discovery due by 10/23/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 06/25/2020. (alb)
June 25, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #7 Answer to Complaint. (See proposed ISO.) (alb)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by JACKSON COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS. (KREBS, ERIC)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC ALEXANDER KREBS on behalf of JACKSON COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS (KREBS, ERIC)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to JACKSON COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, SHAWN WOODS, Division of Risk Management. (Attachments: #1 Division of Risk Management, #2 Shawn Woods) (alb)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MATTOX, MARIE)
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The Civil Cover sheet, doc. #2 Does not match the complaint. Please file the correct Civil Cover Sheet.
May 24, 2020 Filing 2 Disregard wrong case. CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MATTOX, MARIE) Modified on 5/26/2020 (alb).
May 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JACKSON COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, SHAWN WOODS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5255533.), filed by RODNEY RUSSAW. (Attachments: #1 Summons to be issued by clerk, #2 Summons to be issued by Clerk, #3 summons to be issued by Clerk) (MATTOX, MARIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUSSAW v. JACKSON COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACKSON COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAWN WOODS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY RUSSAW
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?