BARBER v. MEDICAL
Plaintiff: CHARLES JUNIOR BARBER
Defendant: MEDICAL
Case Number: 5:2020cv00185
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHARLES JUNIOR BARBER. (jcw)
September 1, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by CHARLES JUNIOR BARBER. (Filing in FLMD and forwarded to FLND) (jcw)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk of the court shall send to Plaintiff a blank motion to proceed in forma pauperis and financial affidavit for a non-prisoner. On or before 9/14/2020, Plaintiff shall pay the $400 fee or submit a completed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and a financial affidavit.Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 8/24/2020. (jcw)(Form sent as ordered.)
July 8, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint - Filing fee was not paid, no service copies filed. (jcw)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 2:20-cv-00465. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER transferring case to the United States District Court, Northern District of Florida, Panama City Division. New Case Number is to be assigned. The Clerk shall terminate any pending motions as moot and close the Fort Myers case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/7/2020. (SLU) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/8/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 TRACK ONE AND RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/1/2020. (SLU) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/8/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for pro se confined litigants. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/1/2020. (SLU) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/8/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Mr. Charles Junior Barber accompanying motion for permission to appeal in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/8/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Medical filed by Charles Junior Barber. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (no service copy)(SLU) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/8/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARBER v. MEDICAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES JUNIOR BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?