THOMAS v. CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA
Plaintiff: STEVE THOMAS
Defendant: CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA
Case Number: 5:2020cv00215
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II: Motion Hearing held on 10/15/2020 re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion for Preliminary Injunction is Denied. 1 Exhibit envelope placed in secured storage. Order entered (Court Reporter Julie Wycoff). (pmc)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - That the Plaintiff's verified motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. #8 ) is DENIED. Additionally, based on the discussions with counsel at the hearing, it is FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for the parties to file the report of their Rule 26(f) conference is extended to November 10, 2020. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/10/2020.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/15/2020. (mb)
October 14, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Second Status Update and Supplemental Authority by CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Mark McQueen, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Bo Creel) (ADKINS, GWENDOLYN)
October 14, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Status Update re: Repeal and Notice of Supplemental Authority by CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Ordinance 2760)) (SEAGLE, SCOTT)
October 5, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or, in the Alternative, Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. (mb)
October 2, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or, in the Alternative, Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by STEVE THOMAS. (HENRY, MICHAEL)
September 29, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #24 Response in Opposition to Motion, #23 Notice of Filing Additional Document in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (doc. #8 ) by CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA re #22 Notice OF FILING DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or, in the Alternative, Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. (mb)
September 28, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or, in the Alternative, Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA. (ADKINS, GWENDOLYN)
September 28, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing Additional Document in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (doc.8) by CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA re #22 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit June 23 application & related documents) (ADKINS, GWENDOLYN)
September 28, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (doc. #8 ) by CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jane Greathouse, #2 Affidavit Tricia Hovis, #3 Affidavit Nevin Zimmerman, #4 Affidavit Hilton "Bo" Creel, #5 Affidavit Donna Newell) (ADKINS, GWENDOLYN)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER, re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time and #18 Response in Opposition. The motion for extension of time is GRANTED, and Defendant shall have until 9/28/2020 to file its response to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. Plaintiff may file a reply to Defendant's response on or before 10/2/2020. Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/15/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 North at the United States Courthouse, 1 North Palafox Street, Pensacola, Florida, before JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/18/2020. (kjw)
September 17, 2020 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II: Telephone Conference held on 9/17/2020 re Motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion granted. Evidentiary hearing on #8 Motion for preliminary injunction Hearing set for 10/15/2020 10:00 AM, Order entered (Court Reporter Julie Wycoff). (pmc)
September 17, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #18 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (jcw)
September 16, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT J SEAGLE on behalf of CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA (SEAGLE, SCOTT)
September 16, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or, in the Alternative, Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law < filed by STEVE THOMAS. (HENRY, MICHAEL)
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF HEARING. TELEPHONIC Hearing set for Thursday, 9/17/2020 @ 08:00 AM C.D. T. before JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II. (mb)
September 15, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint Summons and Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or in the alternative Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memo of Law served on Tricia Houis for City of Panama City on August 20, 2020, filed by STEVE THOMAS. (HENRY, MICHAEL)
September 14, 2020 Set Deadlines re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or, in the Alternative, Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/28/2020)). (mb)
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or, in the Alternative, Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA. (ADKINS, GWENDOLYN)
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA. (ADKINS, GWENDOLYN)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/25/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/26/2020. Discovery due by 1/7/2021. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/11/2020. (mb)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by GWENDOLYN PALMER ADKINS on behalf of CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA (ADKINS, GWENDOLYN)
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STEVE THOMAS re #10 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, (HENRY, MICHAEL)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The portion of the motion seeking an ex parte temporary restraining order is DENIED. The motion otherwise remains pending. Counsel for Defendant needs to file a notice of appearance as soon as possible so the motion for preliminary injunction can be expeditiously considered. Plaintiff shall, upon receipt of this Order, email a copy to Nevin Zimmerman since he is apparently the City Attorney. See Doc. #5 . If Mr. Zimmerman is not representing Defendant in this case, he shall advise Plaintiff who is and ensure that a copy of this Order promptly gets to the appropriate attorney so a notice of appearance (and a response to the motion for preliminary injunction) can be filed sooner rather than later. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/4/2020. (mb)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action served on Greg Brudnicki, Mayor on 8/24/2020, filed by STEVE THOMAS. (HENRY, MICHAEL)
August 20, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or, in the Alternative, Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (mb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or, in the Alternative, Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by STEVE THOMAS. (HENRY, MICHAEL)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA, MAYOR. (mb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE Notice of Challenge to Municipal Ordinance to State Attorney of the Fourteenth Judicial Circuit by STEVE THOMAS (HENRY, MICHAEL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE Notice of Challenge to Municipal Ordinance to Nevin J. Zimmerman, City Attorney, City of Panama City by STEVE THOMAS (HENRY, MICHAEL) Modified on 8/19/2020 to correct title for attorney(alb).
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Notice of Challenge to Municipal Ordinance to Ashley Moody Attorney General State of Florida by STEVE THOMAS (HENRY, MICHAEL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE Summons to be Issued by Clerk by STEVE THOMAS (HENRY, MICHAEL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5594199.), filed by STEVE THOMAS. (HENRY, MICHAEL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (HENRY, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMAS v. CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVE THOMAS
Represented By: MICHAEL JONATHAN HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PANAMA CITY FLORIDA
Represented By: GWENDOLYN PALMER ADKINS
Represented By: SCOTT J SEAGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?