NORWEGIAN HULL CLUB et al v. NORTH STAR FISHING COMPANY LLC et al
Plaintiff: Norwegian Hull Club, Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance PLC, BRIT SYN - 2987, MARKEL SYN - 3000, QBE SYN - 1036, CHANNEL SYN 2015, NEON SYN - 2468 and Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty Marine Insurance Company
Defendant: North Star Fishing Company LLC, Eastern Shipbuilding Group, Inc. and EASTERN SHIPBUILDING GROUP INC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00181
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by EASTERN SHIPBUILDING GROUP INC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/18/2021). (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
November 4, 2021 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #24 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Relief (James C. Johnson) filed by NORTH STAR FISHING COMPANY LLC. (STAHL, JOHN)
November 4, 2021 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Relief filed by NORTH STAR FISHING COMPANY LLC. (STAHL, JOHN)
November 4, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Relief by NORTH STAR FISHING COMPANY LLC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/18/2021). (STAHL, JOHN)
October 22, 2021 Filing 23 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT TO ALL COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that for all future pleadings, for this case and any future cases assigned to Judge Hinkle, any exhibit attached to a document filing should be properly identified. (Example: Deposition of John Doe rather than Exhibit A.) (jcw)
October 21, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF SIMILAR CASE by ALLIANZ GLOBAL CORPORATE & SPECIALTY MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, BRIT SYN - 2987, CHANNEL SYN 2015, MARKEL SYN - 3000, NEON SYN - 2468, NORWEGIAN HULL CLUB, QBE SYN - 1036, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE PLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (CONNER, TIMOTHY)
October 21, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL on behalf of EASTERN SHIPBUILDING GROUP INC (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT THE MOTION TO DISMISS THE ORIGINAL COMPLAINT re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 10/21/2021. (jcw)
October 13, 2021 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ALLIANZ GLOBAL CORPORATE & SPECIALTY MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, BRIT SYN - 2987, CHANNEL SYN 2015, MARKEL SYN - 3000, NEON SYN - 2468, NORWEGIAN HULL CLUB, QBE SYN - 1036, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE PLC identifying Corporate Parent NORWEGIAN HULL CLUB, Corporate Parent Markel Syndicate Management 3000, Corporate Parent Neon Syndicate 2468, Other Affiliate ALLIANZ GLOBAL CORPORATE & SPECIALTY MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance Limited, Other Affiliate Brit Syndicate 2987, Other Affiliate QBE Syndicate COF 1036 for ALLIANZ GLOBAL CORPORATE & SPECIALTY MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, BRIT SYN - 2987, CHANNEL SYN 2015, MARKEL SYN - 3000, NEON SYN - 2468, NORWEGIAN HULL CLUB, QBE SYN - 1036, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE PLC.. (CONNER, TIMOTHY)
October 12, 2021 Filing 18 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against EASTERN SHIPBUILDING GROUP INC, NORTH STAR FISHING COMPANY LLC, filed by MARKEL SYN - 3000, QBE SYN - 1036, NEON SYN - 2468, CHANNEL SYN 2015, NORWEGIAN HULL CLUB, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE PLC, ALLIANZ GLOBAL CORPORATE & SPECIALTY MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, BRIT SYN - 2987. (CONNER, TIMOTHY)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: The deadline to file the Rule 26(f) report is 11/17/2021. Absent good cause set out in the 26(f) report, the discovery deadline will be 6/1/2022 and the trial will occur during the two-week period that begins on 9/19/2022. ( Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 10/20/2021.) Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 10/6/2021. (jcw)
October 4, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by EASTERN SHIPBUILDING GROUP INC. (HARRISON, WILLIAM)
October 4, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Joinder re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by EASTERN SHIPBUILDING GROUP INC. (HARRISON, WILLIAM) Modified on 10/5/2021 to edit title (jcw).
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C), attorney Spencer Hall is admitted pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant North Star Fishing Company, LLC. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 9/30/2021. (jcw)
September 30, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint (An ISO is needed.) (jcw)
September 30, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Spencer Hall.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6373717.). Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
September 29, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN DAVID STAHL on behalf of NORTH STAR FISHING COMPANY LLC (STAHL, JOHN)
September 29, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by NORTH STAR FISHING COMPANY LLC. (GUILDAY, THOMAS)
September 29, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Declarations in Support of Motion to Dismiss by NORTH STAR FISHING COMPANY LLC re #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James Johnson, #2 Affidavit Declaration of J. David Stahl) (GUILDAY, THOMAS)
September 29, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by NORTH STAR FISHING COMPANY LLC. (GUILDAY, THOMAS)
September 29, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by NORTH STAR FISHING COMPANY LLC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/13/2021). (GUILDAY, THOMAS)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Spencer Hall.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6373717.) by NORTH STAR FISHING COMPANY LLC. (HALL, SPENCER)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and Complaint served on North Star Fishing Company LLC on 09/13/2021, filed by ALLIANZ GLOBAL CORPORATE & SPECIALTY MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, BRIT SYN - 2987, CHANNEL SYN 2015, MARKEL SYN - 3000, NEON SYN - 2468, NORWEGIAN HULL CLUB, QBE SYN - 1036, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE PLC. (CONNER, TIMOTHY)
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE by ALLIANZ GLOBAL CORPORATE & SPECIALTY MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, BRIT SYN - 2987, CHANNEL SYN 2015, MARKEL SYN - 3000, NEON SYN - 2468, NORWEGIAN HULL CLUB, QBE SYN - 1036, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE PLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (CONNER, TIMOTHY)
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jcw)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE Summons in a Civil Action - to be issued (Eastern Shipbuilding) by ALLIANZ GLOBAL CORPORATE & SPECIALTY MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, BRIT SYN - 2987, CHANNEL SYN 2015, MARKEL SYN - 3000, NEON SYN - 2468, NORWEGIAN HULL CLUB, QBE SYN - 1036, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE PLC (CONNER, TIMOTHY)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE Summons in a Civil Action - to be issued (North Star) by ALLIANZ GLOBAL CORPORATE & SPECIALTY MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, BRIT SYN - 2987, CHANNEL SYN 2015, MARKEL SYN - 3000, NEON SYN - 2468, NORWEGIAN HULL CLUB, QBE SYN - 1036, ROYAL & SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE PLC (CONNER, TIMOTHY)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (CONNER, TIMOTHY)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6300978.), filed by MARKEL SYN - 3000, QBE SYN - 1036, NEON SYN - 2468, CHANNEL SYN 2015, Norwegian Hull Club, Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance PLC, Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty Marine Insurance Company, BRIT SYN - 2987. (CONNER, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NORWEGIAN HULL CLUB et al v. NORTH STAR FISHING COMPANY LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norwegian Hull Club
Represented By: TIMOTHY JEFFERSON CONNER
Represented By: JENNIFER ANNE MANSFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royal & Sun Alliance Insurance PLC
Represented By: TIMOTHY JEFFERSON CONNER
Represented By: JENNIFER ANNE MANSFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIT SYN - 2987
Represented By: TIMOTHY JEFFERSON CONNER
Represented By: JENNIFER ANNE MANSFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARKEL SYN - 3000
Represented By: TIMOTHY JEFFERSON CONNER
Represented By: JENNIFER ANNE MANSFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QBE SYN - 1036
Represented By: TIMOTHY JEFFERSON CONNER
Represented By: JENNIFER ANNE MANSFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHANNEL SYN 2015
Represented By: TIMOTHY JEFFERSON CONNER
Represented By: JENNIFER ANNE MANSFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEON SYN - 2468
Represented By: TIMOTHY JEFFERSON CONNER
Represented By: JENNIFER ANNE MANSFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: TIMOTHY JEFFERSON CONNER
Represented By: JENNIFER ANNE MANSFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Star Fishing Company LLC
Represented By: JOHN DAVID STAHL
Represented By: SPENCER HALL
Represented By: THOMAS J GUILDAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Shipbuilding Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASTERN SHIPBUILDING GROUP INC
Represented By: GARY K HUNTER, JR
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: WILLIAM GERALD HARRISON, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?