SCHOOLEY v. OPTION ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Plaintiff: GLEN SCHOOLEY
Defendant: OPTION ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION and SAND CANYON CORPORATION
Case Number: 5:2021cv00219
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 11 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against OPTION ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION, filed by GLEN SCHOOLEY. (No service copies filed.) (jcw)
January 10, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #11 Amended Complaint. (jcw)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - The clerk of the court shall strike Plaintiff's first amended complaint. Doc. #9 . On or before 1/13/2022, Plaintiff shall: a. file a notice of voluntary dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A); or b. file an amended complaint in compliance with this order, which shall be typed or clearly written and marked as Plaintiff's "Second Amended Complaint." Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 12/14/2021. (jcw)
December 8, 2021 Filing 9 ***STRICKEN PER #10 ORDER*** FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against OPTION ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION, filed by GLEN SCHOOLEY. (Service copies were not received) (sjb) Modified on 12/14/2021 (jcw).
December 8, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #9 Amended Complaint. (sjb)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - The clerk of the court shall strike Plaintiff's complaint. Doc. #1 . On or before 1/3/2022, Plaintiff shall: a. file a notice of voluntary dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A); or b. file an amended complaint in compliance with this order, which shall be typed or clearly written and marked as Plaintiff's "Amended Complaint." Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 12/2/2021. (jcw)
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number FLN300015026. Fee status updated to paid. (jfj)
November 29, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #7 Filing Fee Received. (jcw)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. On or before 12/10/2021, Plaintiff shall: a. pay the $402.00 fee; or b. submit a fully-completed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis for non-prisoners, using the Northern District of Florida form, which can be found at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/forms/IFP-motion-NonPrisoner.pdf, and include a properly-completed affidavit of financial status. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 11/19/2021. (jcw)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER entered #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall not serve upon Defendant the summons and a copy of the complaint unless and until directed to do so by this court. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 11/19/2021. (jcw)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
November 18, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (alb)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to OPTION ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (summons signed and returned to plaintiff.) (alb)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by GLEN SCHOOLEY. (alb)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OPTION ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION, filed by GLEN SCHOOLEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits Supporting Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (alb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHOOLEY v. OPTION ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLEN SCHOOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTION ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAND CANYON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?