FEASTER v. BOWERS
Plaintiff: JAHLIL FEASTER
Defendant: BOBBY BOWERS
Case Number: 5:2023cv00310
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On or before 2/9/2024, Plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute, failure to pay the filing fee or properly seek leave to proceed in forma pauperis, and failure to comply with an order of this court. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 1/26/2024. (jcw)(Order mailed to address on record and Florida State Prison.)
January 18, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #3 Order - No response filed. (jcw)
December 22, 2023 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Re: #3 ORDER, #2 Notice to Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Returned Mail)(Re-mailed to Florida State Prison.) (jcw)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Complaint. The clerk of the court shall send Plaintiff a notice of voluntary dismissal form and a form application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. This case number should be written on the forms. On or before 1/8/2024, Plaintiff shall: a. file a notice of voluntary dismissal; ORb. submit payment in the amount of $402.00; OR c. file a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on the Northern District form that includes a motion with supporting affidavit, a prisoner consent form and a financial certificate with a printout of transactions in Plaintiff's inmate trust account for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 12/7/2023. (jcw)(Forms sent as ordered.)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (jcw)
December 1, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (jcw)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOBBY BOWERS, filed by JAHLIL FEASTER. (Filing fee was not paid. No service copies filed.) (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEASTER v. BOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAHLIL FEASTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOBBY BOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?