JOHNSON v. DIXON
Petitioner: ELBERT JOHNSON
Respondent: STATE OF FLORIDA and RICKY D DIXON
Case Number: 5:2024cv00003
Filed: January 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ZACHARY C BOLITHO
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Petitioner must show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Failure to do so will result in a recommendation of dismissal of this case. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 02/15/2024.(Show Cause Response due by 3/18/2024.) (alb)
February 15, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #7 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Referred to ZACHARY C BOLITHO. (alb)
February 14, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ELBERT JOHNSON. (alb)
February 14, 2024 Filing 7 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ELBERT JOHNSON. (No service copies.) (alb)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time. The motion (Doc. #5 ) is GRANTED. The deadline for Petitioner to file an amended habeas petition on the Court form AND pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis is extended to February 16, 2024. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 02/06/2024. (alb)
February 6, 2024 Set Deadlines/Hearings re #6 Order. Amended Pleadings due by 2/16/2024. Fee due by 2/16/2024. (alb)
February 6, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION to Extend Time. Referred to ZACHARY C BOLITHO. (alb)
February 5, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Extend Time, by ELBERT JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (alb)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to modify the docket to reflect that Ricky D. Dixon is the sole Respondent in this case. The Clerk also must send Petitioner a petition form for use in 2254 cases, a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, and a prisoner consent form and financial certificate approved for use in this Court. The Clerk should place this case number on the forms. On or before February 2, 2024, Petitioner must file an amended petition on the Court-approved form. Also within that time, Petitioner must: a. submit payment in the amount of $5.00; OR b. file a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on the Court-approved form. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 0/03/2024. RICKY D DIXON added. STATE OF FLORIDA terminated., ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/2/2024.) (Order and forms mailed.) (alb)
January 3, 2024 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
January 3, 2024 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ELBERT JOHNSON. (No service copies, no IFP motion or fee received.) (alb)
January 3, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re: #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (alb)
December 28, 2023 Filing 1 USCA Order transferring case to the Northern District of Florida. (Attachments: #1 USCA COVER LETTER) (alb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. DIXON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ELBERT JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RICKY D DIXON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?