HAMILTON v. REGIONS BANK
Plaintiff: SHANE HAMILTON
Defendant: REGIONS BANK
Case Number: 5:2024cv00212
Filed: September 11, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT ROY VORHEES on behalf of REGIONS BANK (VORHEES, ROBERT)
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER re #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting: The jury trial is set for the trial period that begins on Tuesday, 2/17/2026. The discovery deadline is extended to 8/29/2025. (Dispositive Motions to be filed by 9/19/2025., Mediation Report due by 10/10/2025.), Case referred to mediation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/29/2024. (jcw)
October 29, 2024 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (JOZSI, ELIZABETH)
October 21, 2024 Set Deadline- Status Report due by 11/20/2024. (rcb)
October 15, 2024 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT by REGIONS BANK. (JOZSI, ELIZABETH)
September 20, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by REGIONS BANK. (JOZSI, ELIZABETH)
September 18, 2024 Filing 3 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by REGIONS BANK. (JOZSI, ELIZABETH)
September 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/26/2024. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/28/2024. Discovery due by 1/10/2025. Status Report due by 10/15/2024. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/12/2024. (jcw)
September 11, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by REGIONS BANK from Fourteenth Judical Circuit, Bay County, case number 240000695CA. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-9020107.), filed by REGIONS BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit 2-State Court Notice of Filing Removal, #3 Exhibit 3-Charge of Discrimination, #4 Bay County, FL Docket, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (JOZSI, ELIZABETH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAMILTON v. REGIONS BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANE HAMILTON
Represented By: RYAN BLAKE HOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGIONS BANK
Represented By: ELIZABETH TURNER JOZSI
Represented By: ROBERT ROY VORHEES
Represented By: J ROBERT MCCORMACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?