Black v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff alleged that Apple Inc. engaged in the unlawful tying of its iPod and iTunes Music Store products.

Plaintiff: Fredrick Black
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2007cv61395
Filed: September 28, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft. Lauderdale Office
County: Broward
Presiding Judge: William J. Zloch
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2007 Filing 24
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT as to 23 Transmittal Letter Sent, 22 Order on Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California (lh)
October 17, 2007 Filing 23
Transmittal Letter Sent With Order of Transfer, To: Northern District of California (bs)
October 15, 2007 Filing 21
Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Law by Fredrick Black. (Cotterall, William)
October 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6
ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Responses due by Noon, 10/12/2007.Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 10/3/2007. (bc)
October 2, 2007 Filing 9
Agreed MOTION for Robert A. Mittelstaedt to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #967612. (cw)
October 1, 2007 Filing 4
Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorneys Robert A. Mittelstaedt, Tracy M. Strong, and Lara Kollios, mailing date October 1, 2007. (cw)
September 28, 2007 Filing 3
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Apple, Inc. (vt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Black
Represented By: Edward Royce Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy M. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?