Williams v. R.W. Cannon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
James Williams |
Defendant: |
Robert W. Cannon and R.W. Cannon, Inc. |
Case Number: |
0:2008cv60168 |
Filed: |
February 7, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Florida |
Office: |
Ft. Lauderdale Office |
County: |
Broward |
Presiding Judge: |
Ursula Ungaro |
Nature of Suit: |
Labor: Fair Standards |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 0201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 7, 2010 |
Filing
185
ORDER granting by default 179 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause ( Show Cause Response due by 1/19/2010.); granting by default 179 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. On or before January 19, 2010, each Defendant shall complete, and serve upon Plaintiff's attorney, the required discovery in aid of execution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 1/7/2010. (dlt)
|
October 1, 2009 |
Filing
176
ORDER granting 172 Plaintiff's Request to Compel Post-Judgment Discovery. By November 16, 2009, each Defendant shall complete under oath, Fla.R.Civ.P. Form 1.977, including all required attachments, and serve it on Plaintiff's attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 10/1/2009. (dlt)
|
August 27, 2009 |
Filing
171
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 156 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and costs; denying as moot Plaintiff's 164 Motion for Entry of an Order Granting by Default Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs; and, granting Plaintiff's 169 Motion to Strike as Untimely Declaration of Leslie Langbein, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 8/27/2009. (jse)
|
March 12, 2009 |
Filing
145
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 137 Motion for Award of Liquidated Damages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 3/12/09. (lc2)
|
September 24, 2008 |
Filing
108
ORDER granting, in part, Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 9/24/08. (lc2)
|
September 22, 2008 |
Filing
105
*ORDER to Show Cause and ORDER to file Revised Joint Pretrial Stipulation - Parties must file by 3:00pm on September 23, 2008, (1) show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to comply with Court's Order entered on September 4, 2008, and (2) Revised Joint Pretrial Stipulation. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/22/08. (lc2)
|
September 5, 2008 |
Filing
101
ORDER Re-Setting Calendar Call for 10/8/2008 01:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro, Jury Trial set for two-week period of 10/13/2008 in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro, Pretrial Conference for 9/26/2008 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Revised Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/17/2008. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/4/08. (tp)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?