Managed Care Solutions, Inc. v. Essent Healthcare, Inc.

Plaintiff: Managed Care Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Essent Healthcare, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2009cv60351
Filed: March 6, 2009
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Broward
Presiding Judge: Patricia A. Seitz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2011 382 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Overruling in Part Objections to Magistrate Report, Affirming In Part Magistrate's Report, Denying Essesnt's Motion for Monetary Sanctions and Referring Conduct to the Florida Bar; denying as moot 371 Motion to Strike; granting in part and overruling in part 355 Objections; Overruling 351 Objections to Report and Recommendations; Overruling 353 Objections to Report and Recommendations ; denying 299 Motion for Sanctions; adopting in part 347 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 9/20/2011. (asl) Modified date filed on 9/21/2011 (asl).
July 13, 2011 358 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 350 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 7/13/2011. (mkr)
June 27, 2011 346 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 298 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 298 Motion to Tax Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 6/27/2011. (mkr)
September 7, 2010 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 227 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 9/7/2010. (mkr)
August 27, 2010 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 202 Motion to Quash; granting 207 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 8/27/2010. (mkr)
August 23, 2010 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 187 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 8/23/2010. (mkr)
August 10, 2010 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 199 Motion to Quash; granting 203 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 8/9/2010. (mkr)
May 3, 2010 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 115 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/3/2010. (mms)
January 25, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion to Dismiss Count Two of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 1/22/10. (tas)
June 11, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 6/11/2009. (lc4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Managed Care Solutions, Inc. v. Essent Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Managed Care Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Ingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essent Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?